Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Kernodle
Case #: 6:25-cv-00188
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 21, 2025
Case in other court:Louisiana Western, 5:25-cv-00134
Last checked: Wednesday May 21, 2025 4:08 PM CDT
Petitioner
Jennco Pumping Services L L C
Respondent
Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C
Represented By
David Jonathan Hemken
Cook Yancey King & Galloway, Aplc - Shreveport
contact info
Respondent
Kevin Hoot
Represented By
David Jonathan Hemken
Cook Yancey King & Galloway, Aplc - Shreveport
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 05/23 9:54 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (kcv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
24 24 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 05/21 3:30 PM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 5:25-cv-00134. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Pursuant to LR CV-7(j)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/23 9:53 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Wed 05/21 10:44 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/20/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
22 22 MOTION to Transfer Case by Jennco Pumping Services L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(aty,Maxwell, Parker) Modified docket text on 5/20/2025 (Whitener, M). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
21 21 ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re16 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 5/19/2025. Reply due by 5/26/2025. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 5/13/2025. (crt,Keifer, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
20 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with consent filed by Jennco Pumping Services L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/12/2025.(aty,Maxwell, Parker) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Motions Transferred regarding20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
19 19 ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re16 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 5/12/2025. Reply due by 5/19/2025. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 5/2/2025. (crt,Keifer, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
18 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with consent filed by Jennco Pumping Services L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/1/2025.(aty,Maxwell, Parker) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Motions Transferred regarding18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with consent filed . Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
17 17 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:16 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Whitener, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
16 16 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kevin Hoot, Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C.(aty,Valcho, Ashleigh) Modified docket text on 4/21/2025 (Whitener, M). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Hoot
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C answer due 4/18/2025; Kevin Hoot answer due 4/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/14/2025. (crt,Keller, J) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent by Kevin Hoot, Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/11/2025.(aty,Hemken, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/8/2025. (crt,Rider, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
12 12 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kevin Hoot, Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C. (aty,Hemken, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, with consent. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Kevin Hoot's waiver of service is hereby deemed accepted by the Court as if service occurred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that both defendants Kevin Hoot and Century Oaks Independence Farms, LLC shall have through and until 4/11/2025 to file responsive pleadings or otherwise defend this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/24/2025. (crt,Enkey, R) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
10 10 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to David Jonathan Hemken on behalf of Kevin Hoot, Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 4/4/2025. (crt,Thomas, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to David Jonathan Hemken on behalf of Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/4/2025. (crt,Thomas, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent by All Defendants. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/21/2025.(Attorney David Jonathan Hemken added to party Kevin Hoot(pty:dft), Attorney David Jonathan Hemken added to party Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Hemken, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennco Pumping Services L L C. Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C served on 2/25/2025, answer due 3/18/2025. (aty,Maxwell, Parker) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennco Pumping Services L L C. (aty,Maxwell, Parker) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennco Pumping Services L L C. (aty,Maxwell, Parker) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Century Oaks Independence Farm L L C, Kevin Hoot. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Parker Wayne Maxwell on behalf of Jennco Pumping Services L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/24/2025. (crt,Chavis, J) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Parker Wayne Maxwell on behalf of Jennco Pumping Services L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/24/2025. (crt,Chavis, J) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against Century Oaks Independence Farm LLC, Kevin Hoot (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6184729) filed by Jennco Pumping Services, LLC.(Attorney Parker Wayne Maxwell added to party Jennco Pumping Services, LLC(pty:pet))(aty,Maxwell, Parker) Modified to add filers to text on 2/10/2025 (Chavis, J). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Chavis, J) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 5/21/2025.]
Related: [-]