California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Case #: 2:25-cv-04473
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:May 14, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
5 5 misc Financial Entry Fri 05/23 2:14 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 into the registry of the Court from Juan Antonio Brizuela. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241)1 . Receipt number 1698. (ec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to US District Judge (CV-17) (2241 and 2255) - optional html form Wed 05/21 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer for petition filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
2 2 notice Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111) Wed 05/21 9:52 AM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241)1 . (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
3 3 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 05/21 9:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by petitioner Juan Antonio Brizuela, re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241)1 served on 5/3/2025. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Wed 05/21 9:51 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) (Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE), filed by petitioner Juan Antonio Brizuela. (ghap)
Related: [-]