New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01763
Case Filed:May 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 22, 2025 1:48 AM MDT
Defendant
Roberto Alejandro Lopez-Felix (1)
Represented By
David Benatar
Federal Public Defender District Of New Mexico
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Brenda Richardson
U.S. Probation/pretrial
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jared Kirk Anthony Williams
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 4:46 AM MDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
Arrest of Roberto Alejandro Lopez-Felix (rh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
Hearing as to Roberto Alejandro Lopez-Felix: Initial Appearance set for 5/21/2025 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. (rh)
Related: [-]