California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00815
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 22, 2025 2:09 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael A. Deshong
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kiriaki Grammenidis
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Michael Edward Cartwright (1)
Terminated: 05/08/2025
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Marissa Angela Martinez
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Theodore J. Torres
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 6:34 AM PDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Michael Edward Cartwright (1).(gac) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/21/2025) (stn).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Michael Edward Cartwright. (gac) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/21/2025) (stn).
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER Granting2 Motion to Seal as to Michael Edward Cartwright (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 2/21/2025.(gac) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/21/2025) (stn).
Related: [-]