Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-04056
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Western, 2:25-cv-00563
Last checked: Friday May 23, 2025 11:04 PM EDT
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DUPONT CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS ENTERPRISE 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The Chemours Company
INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DUPONT CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS ENTERPRISE 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Plaintiff
STONEY LOCKLEAR
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Taylor
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenda Simmons
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TRUMAN SCOTT
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LYNN CHAVIS
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TIFFANY NEWTON
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ERICA MCMILLAN
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLES LOCKLEAR
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT CHAVIS
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathleen Hunt
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Henderson
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MERRY HARDIN
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN GREEN
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANITA DIAL-ALLEN
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICIA DEESE
Represented By
Roopal P Luhana
Chaffin Luhana LLP
contact info
Nicholas Farnolo
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
11 11 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 05/22 10:24 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Western, 2:25-cv-563, TAYLOR et al v. 3M COMPANY et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-4056-RMG (rhei, )
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 05/22 10:20 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:25-cv-00563. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
8 8 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received (bjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
7 7 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (bjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/1/25. (bdb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by LYNN CHAVIS, ROBERT CHAVIS, PATRICIA DEESE, ANITA DIAL-ALLEN, KEVIN GREEN, MERRY HARDIN, LINDA HENDERSON, KATHLEEN HUNT, CHARLES LOCKLEAR, STONEY LOCKLEAR, ERICA MCMILLAN, TIFFANY NEWTON, TRUMAN SCOTT, BRENDA SIMMONS, AARON TAYLOR. (Luhana, Roopal) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, AGC CHEMICALS AMERICAS, INC., AMEREX CORPORATION, ARKEMA INC., BASF CORPORATION, CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, CHEMDESIGN PRODUCTS, INC., CHEMGUARD, INC., CHUBB FIRE, LTD., CORTEVA, INC., DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC., DYNAX CORPORATION, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, KIDDE PLC, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS L.P., UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC. (bjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AGC CHEMICALS AMERICAS, INC., AMEREX CORPORATION, ARKEMA INC., BASF CORPORATION, CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, CHEMDESIGN PRODUCTS, INC., CHEMGUARD, INC., CHUBB FIRE, LTD., CORTEVA, INC., DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC., DYNAX CORPORATION, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, KIDDE PLC, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS L.P., UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8833590), filed by KEVIN GREEN, ANITA DIAL-ALLEN, AARON TAYLOR, TIFFANY NEWTON, MERRY HARDIN, PATRICIA DEESE, STONEY LOCKLEAR, KATHLEEN HUNT, BRENDA SIMMONS, LYNN CHAVIS, ROBERT CHAVIS, TRUMAN SCOTT, LINDA HENDERSON, CHARLES LOCKLEAR, ERICA MCMILLAN. (Luhana, Roopal) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak added. (bjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 5/2/2025. (bjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information (email address). CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (bjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/22/2025.]
Related: [-]