New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Referred: Lee G Dunst
Case #: 2:25-cv-02886
Nature of Suit720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations
Cause29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Case Filed:May 23, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 23, 2025 11:03 AM EDT
Petitioner
Electrical Industry Board of Nassau and Suffolk Counties
Respondent
Palace Electrical Contractors Inc.


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 05/23 1:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Palace Electrical Contractors Inc. (LJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 05/23 1:24 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 05/23 1:18 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/23 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lillianna Iorfino on behalf of Electrical Industry Board of Nassau and Suffolk Counties (aty to be noticed) (Iorfino, Lillianna)
Related: [-]
4 4 9 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 05/23 11:07 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re1 Petition re: Arbitration Award,, filed by Electrical Industry Board of Nassau and Suffolk Counties. (Moosnick, Maura)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/23 11:07 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Petition re: Arbitration Award,, by Electrical Industry Board of Nassau and Suffolk Counties (Moosnick, Maura)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/23 11:06 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Electrical Industry Board of Nassau and Suffolk Counties (Moosnick, Maura)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition re: Arbitration Award Fri 05/23 11:04 AM
PETITION re: Arbitration Award , filed by Electrical Industry Board of Nassau and Suffolk Counties. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Moosnick, Maura) Modified on 5/23/2025 (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 2022-2025 CBA,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter of Assent,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Collection Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - December 2024 Arbitration Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - January 27, 2025 Award,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - March 13, 2025 Demand Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - March 2025 Arbitration Notice,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - April 8, 2025 Award,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - April 9, 2025 Demand Letter,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - History Bill for the Court
misc Civil Case Filing Fee Fri 05/23 11:05 AM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-19078064 (Moosnick, Maura)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/23 1:23 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]