Maryland District Court
Judge:Roger W Titus
Referred: William Connelly
Case #: 8:11-cv-01022
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2011
Terminated:Jun 11, 2012
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2017 7:14 AM EST
Defendant
Thales Communications, Inc.
Represented By
Frank C Morris, Jr
Epstein Becker And Green PC
contact info
Kathleen M Williams
Epstein Becker And Green PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Glenn Ostrowski
Represented By
Mitchell I Batt
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/18/2011 8:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 19, 2011
Jury Trial Demand by Glenn Ostrowski. (ranks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
The Above papers are all copies of originals filed in the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland (ranks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 345052-V. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 84637017134), filed by Thales Communications, Inc..(rank, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 COMPLAINT against Thales Communications, Inc., filed by Glenn Ostrowski.(ranks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civl-Non-Domestic Case Information Report,
Att: 2 Notice of New Case Number
3 3 Summons Issued as to Thales Communications, Inc.. (ranks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Scheduling Hearing and Order of Court - Track 3 signed by John W. Debelius, III Circuit Admin. Judge (ranks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed (ranks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]