California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:14-cv-05615
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2014
Terminated:Mar 10, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jun 21, 2015 5:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
Represented By
Nathaniel H. Lipanovich
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Michael David Harbour
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Andra Barmash Greene
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Justin Nathanael Owens
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Alvin Matthew Ashley
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Nathaniel H. Lipanovich
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Michael David Harbour
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Andra Barmash Greene
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Justin Nathanael Owens
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Alvin Matthew Ashley
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
The People of the State of California
Represented By
Ernst Andrew Halperin
Office Of The San Francisco District Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Byron McKnight
Represented By
Nicholas A. Coulson
Liddle & Dubin, P.C.
contact info
Alfredo Torrijos
Arias Ozzello & Gignac LLP
contact info
Steven D. Liddle
Liddle & Dubin, P.C.
contact info
Mickel Montalban Arias
Arias Sanguinetti Stahle & Torrijos, LLP
contact info
Steven Liddle
Liddle & Dubin, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Philliben
Represented By
Nicholas A. Coulson
Liddle & Dubin, P.C.
contact info
Alfredo Torrijos
Arias Ozzello & Gignac LLP
contact info
Steven D. Liddle
Liddle & Dubin, P.C.
contact info
Mickel Montalban Arias
Arias Sanguinetti Stahle & Torrijos, LLP
contact info
Steven Liddle
Liddle & Dubin, P.C.
contact info


1. Uber Riders File Class Action Lawsuit Over 'Safe Rides Fee' (gizmodo.com)
Submitted Mon 12/29/2014
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 22, 2022
276 276 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 12/22 11:16 AM
MANDATE of USCA case number 21-16626 as to241 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Robert Hudson. The judgment of this Court, entered November 30, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $191.40. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
275 275 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 12/22 11:06 AM
MANDATE of USCA case number 21-16625 as to240 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Morgan Gordon,251 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Morgan Gordon. The judgment of this Court, entered November 30, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $24.60. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
274 274 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 12/22 10:03 AM
MANDATE of USCA case number 21-16623 as to239 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Jennifer Hinojosa. The judgment of this Court, entered November 30, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $164.40 (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]