EMMET v. DEL FRANCO et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Douglas E Arpert |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-08014 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 21, 2015 8:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
MARTIN KARO
|
|
Defendant
JOHN OSENDORF
|
|
Defendant
ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY
|
|
Defendant
ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ORGANIC AMERICA
|
|
Defendant
NDF ENTERPRISES
|
|
Defendant
MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE(S) 1-10
|
|
Defendant
HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC
|
|
Defendant
HOMESTEAD HYDRO
|
|
Defendant
THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TOM DEL FRANCO
|
|
Defendant
NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO
|
|
Defendant
D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10
|
|
Notice Only
arbtre
|
|
Plaintiff
PETER W. EMMET
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 04, 2016 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Mon 04/04 2:53 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Eastern District of Michigan as case 2:16-cv-11211, filed 04/04/2016. (dm ) |
||
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Vacate
Thu 03/31 12:50 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to vacate the entry of default; granting16 Defendants' alternative motion to transfer; the Clerk shall transfer this case to the USDC for the Eastern District of Michigan. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/31/2016. (mmh) |
|
39 | 39
12
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Thu 03/31 12:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/31/2016. (mmh) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Thu 03/31 2:24 PM
Case extracted via ECF to the Eastern District of Michigan. (jjc) |
||
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/10 3:40 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/7/2016 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/10/2016. (mmh) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 02/10 10:04 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2016. (ce3) |
||
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Letter
Thu 02/04 2:45 PM
Letter from Ari D. Schneider to Judge Arpert Opposing Plaintiff's Request for an Initial Conference. (SCHNEIDER, ARI) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/02 2:59 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/10/2016 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3) |
||
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Mon 02/01 3:48 PM
Letter from Mark K SIlver to Judge Arpert on behalf of Plaintiff requesting the scheduling of an Initial Conference. (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Fri 12/11 5:42 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO, TOM DEL FRANCO, HOMESTEAD HYDRO, HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, MARTIN KARO, MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS, NDF ENTERPRISES, ORGANIC AMERICA, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY, ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC, JOHN OSENDORF, THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC re17 MOTION to Vacate Default (SCHNEIDER, ARI) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Tom Del Franco, | ||
Att: 2 Certification Martin Karo, | ||
Att: 3 8 pgs Brief Reply Brief in support of Motion to Vacate Default, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Certificate of Service Certificate of Service | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Fri 12/11 4:23 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO, TOM DEL FRANCO, HOMESTEAD HYDRO, HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, MARTIN KARO, MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS, NDF ENTERPRISES, ORGANIC AMERICA, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY, ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC, JOHN OSENDORF, THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC, arbtre re16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (SCHNEIDER, ARI) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Reply Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/04 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ARI D. SCHNEIDER on behalf of All Defendants(SCHNEIDER, ARI) |
|
Att: 1 Statement Notice of Appearance, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certification of Service | ||
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/02 12:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10, D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO, TOM DEL FRANCO, HOMESTEAD HYDRO, HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, MARTIN KARO, MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS, NDF ENTERPRISES, ORGANIC AMERICA, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY, ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC, JOHN OSENDORF, THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC (CERIMELE, ERNESTO) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 11/24 3:53 PM
Letter from Plaintiff to Judge Arpert re: Defendants failure to comply with Court Order re30 Order. (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/20 4:06 PM
AMENDED ORDER. This Order supersedes the Court's Order entered on October 13, 2015. (See ECF No.28 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/20/2015. (mmh) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 10/14 10:37 AM
Letter from Mark K. Silver, Esq. to Judge Arpert Requesting Minor Amendment to Order re28 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,. (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 10/13 3:45 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Defendants shall have 30 days from the entry of this Order to retain new counsel; that, if new counsel has not entered an appearance on behalf of Defendants within 30 days, (1) the individual defendants shall be deemed to be proceeding pro se; and (2) the corporate defendants shall be deemed to be in default; that the deadline to file reply briefs with respect to the two pending motions [ECF Nos.16 ,17 ] is extended to December 11, 2015. Attorney ERNESTO CERIMELE and HENRY E. KLINGEMAN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/13/2015. (mmh) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 10/07 4:26 PM
Letter from Mark K. Silver, Esq. to Judge Arpert responding to letter from Defendants re26 Letter. (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 10/06 6:00 PM
Letter from Ernesto Cerimele, Esq.. (CERIMELE, ERNESTO) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Fri 10/02 2:42 PM
Letter from Mark K. Silver, Esq. to Judge Arpert Requesting Scheduling of Initial Case Management Conference. (SILVER, MARK) |
|
24 | 24
2
pgs
respm
Certification in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/02 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by PETER W. EMMET re16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 34 pgs Exhibit A to Certification of Mark K. Silver | ||
23 | 23
respm
Certification in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/02 2:40 PM
CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by PETER W. EMMET re16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (SILVER, MARK) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/02 2:40 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by PETER W. EMMET re16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (SILVER, MARK) |
|
21 | 21
14
pgs
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/02 2:35 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by PETER W. EMMET re17 MOTION to Vacate Default (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 09/29 8:28 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 11/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh) |
||
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 09/28 3:58 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10, D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO, TOM DEL FRANCO, HOMESTEAD HYDRO, HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, MARTIN KARO, MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS, NDF ENTERPRISES, ORGANIC AMERICA, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY, ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC, JOHN OSENDORF, THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC.(KLINGEMAN, HENRY) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Certification, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/24 3:52 PM
ORDER adjourning the Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Vacate the Defaults; ORDERED that Plaintiff's oppositions to the aforementioned Motions are due on or before 10/5/2015 RESET Deadlines as to17 MOTION to Vacate Default ,16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , Motions RESET for 11/2/2015 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The motions will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/24/2015. (kas, ) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Thu 08/20 2:54 PM
Letter from Mark K. Silver, Esq. forwarding proposed Order for Briefing Schedule re: defendants' motion to dismiss and motion to vacate default re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,17 MOTION to Vacate Default ,16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint .(SILVER, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Vacate
Thu 08/13 5:22 PM
MOTION to Vacate Default by TOM DEL FRANCO, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC.(CERIMELE, ERNESTO) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Certification, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/13 5:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10, D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO, TOM DEL FRANCO, HOMESTEAD HYDRO, HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10.(CERIMELE, ERNESTO) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/14 9:08 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 9/8/2015 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (km) |
||
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 07/21 3:02 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time. The time within which Defendants shall respond to the Complaint is extended through and including 8/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/21/2015. (mmh) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Tue 07/21 10:02 AM
Letter from Ernesto Cerimele, Esq..(CERIMELE, ERNESTO) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/09 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of PETER W. EMMET (SILVER, MARK) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Thu 07/09 10:08 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC, MARTIN KARO, D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS, ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC, NDF ENTERPRISES, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO, ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY, ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC, THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA, HOMESTEAD HYDRO, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC, JOHN OSENDORF has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/23/2015. (mmh, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Wed 07/08 3:30 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Del Franco et al. Attorney HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for TOM DEL FRANCO,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for HOMESTEAD HYDRO,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for JOHN DOE(S) 1-10,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for MARTIN KARO,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for NDF ENTERPRISES,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for ORGANIC AMERICA,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for JOHN OSENDORF,HENRY E. KLINGEMAN,ERNESTO CERIMELE for THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC added. (KLINGEMAN, HENRY) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 07/02 2:53 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Thomas Del Franco and Organic America Farms of Amherst, LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (kas, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
misc
Request for Default
Wed 07/01 10:40 AM
Request for Default by PETER W. EMMET against defendants, Thomas Del Franco and Organic America Farms of Amherst, LLC.(MEISNER, JASON) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Jason A. Meisner, Esq., | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/01 10:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER W. EMMET. D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; HOMESTEAD HYDRO served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; MARTIN KARO served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; NDF ENTERPRISES served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; ORGANIC AMERICA served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015; THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015. (MEISNER, JASON) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/17 3:30 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for alternative service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/17/2015. (eaj) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Tue 05/26 12:23 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by PETER W. EMMET re5 MOTION Serving Defendants Martin Karo and Nicholas DelFranco and the Entity Defendants through their attorneys Jeffrey Lichtman, Esq. and Gerald Shargel, Esq. (MEISNER, JASON) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/20 4:03 PM
LETTER ORDER Denying Defendants request for an extension to respond to the5 MOTION Serving Defendants Martin Karo and Nicholas DelFranco and the Entity Defendants through their attorneys Jeffrey Lichtman, Esq. and Gerald Shargel, Esq. . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/20/2015. (eaj) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Mon 05/18 3:03 PM
Letter from Jason A. Meisner, Esq. in response to Defendants' May 15, 2015, pro se letter requesting an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service. (MEISNER, JASON) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/11 9:12 AM
Set Deadlines as to5 MOTION Serving Defendants Martin Karo and Nicholas DelFranco and the Entity Defendants through their attorneys Jeffrey Lichtman, Esq. and Gerald Shargel, Esq. . Motion set for 6/1/2015 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh) |
||
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/08 1:54 PM
MOTION Serving Defendants Martin Karo and Nicholas DelFranco and the Entity Defendants through their attorneys Jeffrey Lichtman, Esq. and Gerald Shargel, Esq. by PETER W. EMMET.(MEISNER, JASON) |
|
Att: 1 7 pgs Brief, | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Certification of Jason A. Meisner, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 110 pgs Exhibit A-V, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/16 1:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER W. EMMET. TOM DEL FRANCO served on 1/12/2015, answer due 2/2/2015. (MEISNER, JASON) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed Affidavit of Service
Thu 04/16 1:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER W. EMMET. ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC served on 1/14/2015, answer due 2/4/2015., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Josh Young, Manager on 1/14/15, filed by PETER W. EMMET. (MEISNER, JASON) |
|
Wednesday, December 24, 2014 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/24 2:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO, TOM DEL FRANCO, HOMESTEAD HYDRO, HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC, MARTIN KARO, MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS, NDF ENTERPRISES, ORGANIC AMERICA, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY, ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC, JOHN OSENDORF, THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAWEIA CAMPBELL* (jjc) |
|
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
1 | 1
30+
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/24 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10, D&G GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO, TOM DEL FRANCO, HOMESTEAD HYDRO, HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, MARTIN KARO, MAD HATTER NUTRIENTS AND SOILS, NDF ENTERPRISES, ORGANIC AMERICA, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS OF AMHERST, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA FARMS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA OF FORT MYERS, LLC, ORGANIC AMERICA SUPPLY, ORGANIC AMERICA WHOLESALE, LLC, JOHN OSENDORF, THE HOMESTEAD GREENHOUSE LEASING COMPANY, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6120116) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PETER W. EMMET.(jjc) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit B |