California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Referred: Paul Singh Grewal
Case #: 5:14-cv-05621
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Dec 24, 2014
Terminated:Jun 02, 2015
Last checked: Monday Jun 22, 2015 6:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Zuffa, LLC
Represented By
William A. Isaacson
Boies Schiller & Flexner
contact info
Richard James Pocker
Boies, Schiller And Flexner LLP
contact info
John F. Cove, Jr.
Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Steven Christopher Holtzman
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Perry Maxwell Grossman
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Suzanne Elizabeth Jaffe
contact info
Plaintiff
Pablo Garza
Represented By
Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Benjamin Doyle Brown
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Andrew Michael Purdy
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Joshua P. Davis
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Kevin E. Rayhill
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Eric L. Cramer
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Hiba Hafiz
contact info
Michael C Dell'Angelo, IV
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Vera
Represented By
Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Benjamin Doyle Brown
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Andrew Michael Purdy
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Joshua P. Davis
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Kevin E. Rayhill
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Eric L. Cramer
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Hiba Hafiz
contact info
Michael C Dell'Angelo, IV
contact info
Frederick S. Schwartz
Law Office Of Frederick S. Schwartz
contact info

GPO Apr 17 2015
ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. These parties will participate in mediation with a mutually agreed upon mediator at a time to be agreed upon not later than September 30, 2015 in satisfaction of the parties' ADR obligations in this case pursuant to Civil L.R. 16-8 and ADR L.R. 3-5. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/17/2015. Motions terminated: (28 in 5:15-cv-00521-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC, (77 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC, (21 in 5:15-cv-01324-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC, (50 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC, (50 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
GPO May 26 2015
ORDER GRANTING (35 in 5:15-cv-00521-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (34) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Mac Danzig, Gabe Ruediger, (58 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (57) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Luis Javier Vazquez, (89 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (87) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Cung Le, (58 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (57) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Pablo Garza, Brandon Vera, (30 in 5:15-cv-01324-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (29) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Darren Uyenoyama, Kyle Kingsbury, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (87 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery, (57 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery, (57 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery, (34 in 5:15-cv-00521-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery, (29 in 5:15-cv-01324-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery: Responses due by 6/3/2015. Replies due by 6/17/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/26/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
GPO Jun 02 2015
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk shall TRANSFER the above-captioned actions to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada, Las Vegas Division, and close this court's files. All matters calendared before the undersigned are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, June 04, 2015
63 63 misc Receipt Mon 06/08 11:27 AM
Receipt of acknowledgment from District of Nevada. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
62 62 order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Tue 06/02 4:57 PM
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk shall TRANSFER the above-captioned actions to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada, Las Vegas Division, and close this court's files. All matters calendared before the undersigned are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2015
61 61 order Order on Stipulation Mon 06/01 5:04 PM
ORDER Granting (91) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05484-EJD; Granting (60) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05591-EJD; Granting (60) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05621-EJD; Granting (37) Stipulation in case 5:15-cv-00521-EJD; Granting (32) Stipulation in case 5:15-cv-01324-EJD to STAY DISCOVERYPENDING RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO TRANSFER. Discovery will be stayed pending the resolution of the pending Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/1/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2015
60 60 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 05/29 4:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
Related: [-]