Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Kennelly
Case #: 1:14-cv-08926
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2014
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 8:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Aabvie Inc.
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Auxillium Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
John Doe Drug Company 1-5
Defendant
Paddock Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Inc Pfizer
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017
Defendant
Watson-Actavis Pharmaceuticals
Plaintiff
Robert W. Summers
Represented By
Edward S Cook
Cook P.C.
contact info
Robert R. Underwood, II
Underwood Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/16/2015 3:43 AM CST
Wednesday, October 22, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX14109) filed by Robert W. Summers.(NAS) ***STRICKEN per Order3 Modified on 10/27/2014 to edit text (BD). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/24/2014.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Thursday, October 23, 2014
2 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/23/2014.(JW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/24/2014.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Management Report Form,
Att: 2 Consent Letter and Form
Friday, October 24, 2014
3 3 ORDER striking1 Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint curing the shotgun nature of the Complaint and curing the jurisdictional deficiencies on or before November 14, 2014. Failure to do so may result in a dismissal of this action. Defendants shall respond to any amended complaint in accordance with the requirements of Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/24/2014. (KAB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/24/2014.]
Related: [-]