New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Case #: 1:11-cv-03234
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2011
Terminated:Mar 31, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2017 5:45 AM EST
Defendant
Kenneth Majerus
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
William H Ng
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
INCOMPLETE NAME ATTORNEY
Corp. Counsel Of The City Of Ny
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
William H Ng
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Michael Cardozo
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
William H Ng
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Pressley
1232 Schenectady Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11203
Represented By
Andre Ramon Soleil
Soleil, Onua & Associates, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Inga Van Eysden
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Gabriel Taussig
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Stuart Smith
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Eric Rundbaken
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Gail Rubin
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Georgia Pestana
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mark Palomino
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Office of Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
INCOMPLETE NAME ATTORNEY
Corp. Counsel Of The City Of Ny
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Foster Mills
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Fay Leoussis
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Muriel Goode-Trufant
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Corporation Counsel New York City Law Department 100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Gallay
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Rita D. Dumain
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Judith Davidow
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Marc Andes
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Amy Laura Ventry-Kagan
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Adam Colon
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alex Ali Ayazi
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info

GPO Jul 21 2011
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiff's 2 request to proceed in forma pauperis is denied and she is directed to pay the statutory filing fee of $ 350 within 14 days of the date of this Order in order to proceed with this action. No summons shall issue at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for 14 days or until Plaintiff has complied with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee within the time allowed, the instant complaint shall be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge Sandra L. Townes, on 7/21/2011. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
GPO Jan 14 2013
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, For the reasons set forth above, Defts' partial 57 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Accordingly, Pltff's only surviving claims include: 1) the First and Second Counts, pursuant to Title VII, (which were not included in this motion to dismiss), against the City; and 2) the Sixth Count, pursuant to sec. 1983 under Fourth Amendment, against the City, Cardozo, and Majerus. All other Counts and individual defts are dismissed from the action. Additionally, Pltff's request to vacate various discovery rulings (Docket #82) is DENIED in its entirety. (Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 1/11/2013) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
GPO Apr 12 2013
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's request to vacate various discovery rulings (Docket Nos. 99 and 101) is DENIED in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 4/11/2013. (Brucella, Michelle)
GPO Nov 13 2013
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion to Compel: For the reasons set forth in the attached Summary Order, Plaintiff's motion to compel is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 11/13/2013. (Stevens, Alexis)
GPO Aug 27 2015
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 173 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Cardozo, Kenneth Majerus, City of New York, 188 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants filed by Melissa Pressley: For the reasons stated in the attached Report and Recommendation, I respectfully recommend that: Defendants' motion for summary judgment be granted and Plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment be denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/14/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/27/2015. (Stevens, Alexis)
GPO Mar 31 2016
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons set forth in the 194 Report and Recommendation, the Court grants Defendants' 173 motion for summary judgment and denies Plaintiff's 188 cross motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment in Defendants' favor and terminate this action. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/31/2016. (Merin, Eric)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.