Joseph Arpaio v. Barack Obama, et al
Original Case: 1:14-cv-01966
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:14-cvus-05325 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 3:06 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Barack Obama
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jeh Charles Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Leon Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Eric H. Holder, Jr.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Loretta E. Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Movant-Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Harold W. Van Allen
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joseph M. Arpaio
|
Represented By
|
![]() OPINION filed [1567834] (Pages: 23) for the Court by Judge Pillard, CONCURRING OPINION (Pages: 14) by Judge Brown. [14-5325] |
1. | Appeal date set on Sheriff Joe Arpaio's immigration lawsuit (msnbc.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/04/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 3:06 AM EST |
Monday, December 29, 2014 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 14-5325 | ||
![]() |
||
![]() |
||
![]() |
||
![]() |