California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Case #: 5:14-cv-05659
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2014
Re-opened:May 19, 2020
Terminated:Nov 06, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jun 28, 2015 4:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Endara
Represented By
Matthew Evan Miller
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
William H Anderson
Cuneo Gilbert And Laduca, LLP
contact info
Jonas Palmer Mann
Audet & Partners LLP
contact info
Charles J. LaDuca
Cuneo Gilbert And Laduca, LLP
contact info
Michael Andrew McShane
Audet & Partners LLP
contact info
Jon Michael Herskowitz
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Orshan
Represented By
Matthew Evan Miller
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
William H Anderson
Cuneo Gilbert And Laduca, LLP
contact info
Jonas Palmer Mann
Audet & Partners LLP
contact info
Charles J. LaDuca
Cuneo Gilbert And Laduca, LLP
contact info
Michael Andrew McShane
Audet & Partners LLP
contact info
Jon Michael Herskowitz
contact info
Plaintiff
David Henderson
Represented By
Jonas Palmer Mann
Audet & Partners LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 18 2015
ORDER GRANTING 12 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc. Pursuant to Rule 6-1(a) of the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, it is hereby stipulated by and among Plaintiffs and Defendant and through their counsel of record that Defendant shall have anadditional thirty (30) days, until March 25, 2015, in which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/18/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
GPO Aug 24 2015
15. Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015) ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/27/2015, is CONTINUED. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/20
GPO Mar 27 2018
ORDER GRANTING 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
GPO Nov 06 2018
Order granting 52 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2018. The Clerk shall close the file. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
GPO Sep 30 2024
/21/2024. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2024)ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 194 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS AND 213 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY; GRANTING 226 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/30/2024. Stipulated Schedule or Status Report due by 10

1. The Storage Lawsuit Against Apple Is Beyond Frivolous (seekingalpha.com)
Submitted Mon 01/05/2015
2. Apple facing lawsuit because iOS 8 takes up too much space (geek.com)
Submitted Mon 01/05/2015
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
258 258 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/08 9:49 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/6/2025 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Paul Orshan, Steven Neocleous, Christopher Endara, Shaefer Wiese, Kye Weasner, Michael Walker, Deanna Ness, Margaret Hart, David Henderson, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (McShane, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
257 257 misc Transcript Wed 05/07 3:14 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/06/2025, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (Fisher, Summer)
Related: [-] 255 Transcript Order (s)255
256 256 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 05/07 12:47 PM
STIPULATION TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE filed by Paul Orshan, Steven Neocleous, Christopher Endara, Shaefer Wiese, Kye Weasner, Michael Walker, Deanna Ness, Margaret Hart, David Henderson.(McShane, Michael) Modified on 5/7/2025 (crr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Request to Modify Case Schedule
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
255 255 misc Transcript Order Tue 05/06 4:53 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/06/2025 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Powers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
254 254 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/06 3:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Status Conference held on 5/6/2025. Parties to meet and confer and agree to schedule and extension of expert discovery. Further Status Conference set for June 5, 2025, at 10:00 AM via Videoconference before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Status Report due by May 29, 2025. Total Time in Court: 37 min (10:07-10:44 AM). Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: William Anderson, Ling Kuang. Defendant Attorney: Matthew Powers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2025)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
253 253 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 05/02 7:28 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert K. Shelquist Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Shelquist, Robert)
Related: [-]