California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:11-cv-03764
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2011
Terminated:Mar 31, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Nov 16, 2017 2:16 AM PST
Defendant
Hulu, LLC
Represented By
Matthew David Powers
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Simon J. Frankel
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Brian J Finkelstein
Omelveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Robert Michael Schwartz
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Katherine Robison
Zwillgen Law LLP
contact info
Victor Jih
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Steven Matthew Dunst
O'Melveny Myers LLP
contact info
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amy Lucas
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Randall W. Edwards
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Couch
Represented By
David A. Stampley
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Brian Russell Strange
Strange & Butler
contact info
Scott A Kamber
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Garvey
Represented By
David Christopher Parisi
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
David A. Stampley
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Carpenter Law
contact info
Azita Moradmand
contact info
Suzanne L. Havens Beckman
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
Deborah Kravitz
Kamberlaw LLP
contact info
Grace E. Tersigni
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Brian Russell Strange
Strange & Butler
contact info
Scott A Kamber
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cristina Garza
Represented By
David A. Stampley
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Carpenter Law
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Brian Russell Strange
Strange & Butler
contact info
Scott A Kamber
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Concepcion Jauregui
Represented By
David A. Stampley
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Carpenter Law
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Brian Russell Strange
Strange & Butler
contact info
Scott A Kamber
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Silviano Moncada
Represented By
David A. Stampley
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Carpenter Law
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Brian Russell Strange
Strange & Butler
contact info
Scott A Kamber
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandra Peralta
Represented By
David Christopher Parisi
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Carpenter Law
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Torres
Represented By
David Christopher Parisi
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Carpenter Law
contact info
Suzanne L. Havens Beckman
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Brian Russell Strange
Strange & Butler
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacey Tsan
Represented By
David Christopher Parisi
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
David A. Stampley
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Carpenter Law
contact info
Suzanne L. Havens Beckman
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
Deborah Kravitz
Kamberlaw LLP
contact info
Grace E. Tersigni
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Scott A Kamber
Kamberlaw, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Wymyczak
Represented By
David Christopher Parisi
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Carpenter Law
contact info
Suzanne L. Havens Beckman
Parisi & Havens LLP
contact info
Joseph H Malley
Law Office Of Joseph H. Malley, PC
contact info
Brian Russell Strange
Strange & Butler
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kissmetrics
Terminated: 10/26/2011
Represented By
Daniel Y Li
Gibson Dunn Crutcher
contact info
Stephen Walter Cusick
Nielsen, Haley & Abbott LLP
contact info
S. Ashlie Beringer
Facebook
contact info
Joshua Aaron Jessen
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 28 2012
ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/28/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
GPO Apr 02 2012
ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/2/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
GPO May 16 2012
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS: Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/16/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
GPO Jun 11 2012
ORDER GRANTING IN PART, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 49 as to Claims Two through Seven, ORDERING further briefing, and Setting Hearing on 49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/11/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
GPO Jul 09 2012
ORDER VACATING ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND RESETTING AUGUST 23, 2012 HEARING DATE TO AUGUST 17, 2012 AT 11:00 A.M.: Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset to 8/17/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/9/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
GPO Aug 10 2012
ORDER by Judge Beeler denying 49 Motion to Dismiss (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
GPO Sep 19 2012
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLEADING DEADLINES: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/18/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
GPO Sep 04 2013
ORDER re 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Paul Torres, Joshua Wymyczak, Joseph Garvey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/4/2013. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
GPO Oct 18 2013
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
GPO Oct 24 2013
ORDER Re Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 125, Parisi Declaration 128, and Amending Order 126. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/24/2013. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
GPO Dec 18 2013
ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR JOSEPH H. MALLEY RE HULU'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION ON DAMAGES: Re 151 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Hulu's Summary Judgment Motion on Damages; [Proposed] Order filed by Joseph Garvey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/18/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
GPO Dec 20 2013
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 124 Motion for Summary Judgment.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
GPO Feb 01 2014
ORDER allowing further sealing of exhibits (per ECF Nos. 180-183) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 2/1/2014)
GPO Apr 28 2014
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART HULUS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (COMSCORE AND FACEBOOK): Re ECF No. 125-4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal/To File Portions Of Motion By Defendant Hulu, LLC For Summary Judgment (RE: Comscore And Facebook "Like" Button Under Seal Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5(b)-(d) filed by Hulu, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/28/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
GPO Jun 17 2014
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Denying 111 Motion to Certify Class. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
GPO Jul 14 2014
ORDER by Judge Beeler granting in part and denying in part (without prejudice) 223 Plaintiffs' discovery requests set forth in the parties' Joint Discovery Letter Brief (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
GPO Jul 21 2014
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/21/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
GPO Jul 24 2014
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 10/23/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 11/9/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Renewed Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 2/19/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Hearing on ulu Motion for Summary Judgment set for 12/18/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 8/20/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/24/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
GPO Jan 21 2015
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler on 273 Discovery Letter Brief. The court holds that the material that Hulu redacted from sealed Exhibits A and B to the parties' joint discovery letter is exempted from discovery by the attorney-client privilege. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
GPO Mar 31 2015
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 230 Motion for Summary Judgment (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 29, 2015
307 307 appeal Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate Thu 10/29 1:49 PM
CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
Related: [-]
306 306 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 10/29 1:47 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to300 Notice of Appeal filed by Paul Torres, Sandra Peralta, Joshua Wymyczak, Joseph Garvey (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
Related: [-]