Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Phyllis M Jones
Case #: 3:15-bk-10029
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2015
Terminated:Feb 29, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Oct 23, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ridgefield Christian School, Inc.
3824 Casey Springs Rd
Jonesboro, AR 72404-0940
Represented By
James F. Dowden
James F. Dowden, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


1. Jonesboro School Files for Bankruptcy, Lists $2.1M in Debts (arkansasbusiness.com)
Submitted Mon 02/02/2015
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
72 72 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/02 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 70 Final Decree. (Related Doc 69) Entered on Docket 2/29/2016 (Johnson, LaTrese)
Monday, February 29, 2016
71 71 court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 02/29 5:25 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. The Trustee Has Performed All Duties Required and is Discharged From and Relieved of His Trust. (Johnson, LaTrese)
Related: [-]
70 70 order Final Decree Mon 02/29 11:00 AM
Final Decree. Related [+] Entered on Docket 2/29/2016 (Johnson, LaTrese)
Related: [-] 69
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
69 69 motion Final Decree Wed 02/24 8:53 AM
Motion for Final Decree Ch. 11 Final Report and Account Filed by James F. Dowden on behalf of Ridgefield Christian School, Inc. (Dowden, James)
Related: [-]