Member Case
Lead case is: 7:15-bk-22017

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:15-bk-22019
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2015
Terminated:Jul 06, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC
4000 Veterans Memorial Hwy Fl 2
Bohemia, NY 11716-1040
Represented By
Michael P. Cooley
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
19 19 order Application, Final Decree Wed 07/06 3:55 PM
Order signed on 7/5/2016 Granting Application for Final Decree Closing Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Related [+]. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-] 16
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 07/06 5:05 PM
Case Closed. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
18 18 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Thu 06/30 5:02 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Related [+] Filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
17 17 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 06/29 5:23 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC.(Smith, Frances)
Related: [-] 16
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
16 16 motion Application, Final Decree Tue 06/21 3:35 PM
Application for Final Decree filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC Responses due by 6/28/2016, with presentment to be held on 6/30/2016 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2015
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/10 5:27 PM
Certificate of Service for Rejection Damages Claim Filed by Shawn M. Christianson on behalf of Oracle America, Inc.. (Christianson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Tue 03/10 4:27 PM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 20, 2015
14 14 misc Schedules Fri 02/20 10:41 AM
Schedules filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC , Statement of Financial Affairs of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC Filed by Rakhee V. Patel on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. (Patel, Rakhee)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Fri 02/20 3:26 PM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Summary of Schedules, Schedules A, B, D, E, F, G and H, Statement of Financial Affairs. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 03, 2015
13 13 notice Notice, Change of Address of Debtor/Creditor Tue 02/03 5:39 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Debtor Change of Mailing Address filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 02, 2015
12 12 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Mon 02/02 4:49 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice of Adjourned Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/5/2015 at 02:00 PM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, January 21, 2015
11 11 motion Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 01/21 4:16 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information By Presentment on February 4, 2015 at 12:00 noon filed by Rakhee V. Patel on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC with hearing to be held on 2/4/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse Objections due by 1/30/2015,. (Patel, Rakhee) Modified on 1/22/2015 (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 01/21 8:41 AM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors, Attorney Disclosure Statement. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 20, 2015
10 10 misc Rule 2016 Statement Tue 01/20 10:13 PM
Rule 2016 Statement Disclosure of Attorney Compensation for Attorney for Debtor - Shackelford, Melton, McKinley & Norton, LLP Filed by Rakhee V. Patel on behalf of Shackelford, Melton, McKinley & Norton, LLP. (Patel, Rakhee)
Related: [-]
9 9 ans Statement Tue 01/20 5:06 PM
Statement /Consolidated List of the Debtors' 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Rakhee V. Patel on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. (Patel, Rakhee)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 09, 2015
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sat 01/10 12:26 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 01/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
7 7 order Motion, Joint Administration Fri 01/09 3:42 PM
Order signed 1/9/2015 Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases of: J & B Partners Management, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island Holding Co., LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of NYDMA, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Massapequa Park, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Middle Island, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Shirley, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island II, LLC; J & B Real Estate Partners of Long Island, LLC; J & B Real Estate Partners of Long Island II, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, J & B Partners Management, LLC, case no. 15 B 22017 (RDD) Related [+]. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-] 4
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Fri 01/09 4:10 PM
Case Joint Administration - the lead case is J & B Partners Management LLC, 15 B 22017 (RDD) (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 07, 2015
6 6 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 01/07 5:50 PM
Notice of Appearance AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS filed by Brent Ian Weisenberg on behalf of Brixmor Property Group, Inc.. (Weisenberg, Brent)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC) Wed 01/07 12:58 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/4/2015 at 01:00 PM at Room 243A, White Plains Courthouse. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion, Joint Administration Wed 01/07 1:35 AM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Michael P. Cooley on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. (Cooley, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 01/07 12:37 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate parents added to case: J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island Holding Co., LLC. Corporate Affiliates added to case:, J & B Partners Management LLC, J & B Restaurant Partners of NY, LLC. Filed by Michael P. Cooley on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. (Cooley, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Matrix Wed 01/07 12:31 AM
Matrix Filed by Michael P. Cooley on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. (Cooley, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association -Related Wed 01/07 12:53 PM
Case Related to 14-23393 rdd J & B Restaurant Partners of NY, LLC . (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 01/07 12:58 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Corp. Ownership Stmt; Cred List Needed on Dkt; List of All Creditors; Schedule C; Eq. Sec. Hold. List and Summ. of Schedules Pg 2 . (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 06, 2015
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 01/06 6:44 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A due 01/20/2015. Schedule B due 01/20/2015. Schedule C due 01/20/2015. Schedule D due 01/20/2015. Schedule E due 01/20/2015. Schedule F due 01/20/2015. Schedule G due 01/20/2015. Schedule H due 01/20/2015. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 01/20/2015. Summary of schedules - Page 2 (Statistical Summary) due 01/20/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/20/2015. Atty Disclosure State. due 01/20/2015. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 01/20/2015. List of all creditors due 01/20/2015. List of All Creditors Required on Case Docket in PDF Format due 01/20/2015. List of Equity Security Holders due 01/20/2015. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 01/20/2015. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 01/20/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 01/20/2015, Filed by Michael P. Cooley of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC. (Cooley, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/06 6:45 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-22019 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10487181. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1