Member Case
Lead case is: 7:15-bk-22017

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:15-bk-22023
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2015
Terminated:Jul 06, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC
4000 Veterans Memorial Hwy Fl 2
Bohemia, NY 11716-1040
Represented By
Michael P. Cooley
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


1. Friendly's franchisee on Long Island files for Chapter 11 (newsday.com)
Submitted Wed 01/07/2015
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
18 18 order Application, Final Decree Wed 07/06 3:58 PM
Order signed on 7/5/2016 Granting Application for Final Decree Closing Debtors' Chapter 11 Case Related [+]. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-] 15
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 07/06 5:07 PM
Case Closed. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
17 17 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Thu 06/30 5:08 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Related [+] Filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
16 16 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 06/29 5:26 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC.(Smith, Frances)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
15 15 motion Application, Final Decree Tue 06/21 3:39 PM
Application for Final Decree filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC Responses due by 6/28/2016, with presentment to be held on 6/30/2016 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2015
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/10 5:29 PM
Certificate of Service for Rejection Damages Claim Filed by Shawn M. Christianson on behalf of Oracle America, Inc.. (Christianson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Tue 03/10 4:29 PM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 20, 2015
13 13 misc Schedules Fri 02/20 10:53 AM
Schedules filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC , Statement of Financial Affairs of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC Filed by Rakhee V. Patel on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. (Patel, Rakhee)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Fri 02/20 3:30 PM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Summary of Schedules, Schedules A, B, D, E, F, G and H, Statement of Financial Affairs. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 03, 2015
12 12 notice Notice, Change of Address of Debtor/Creditor Tue 02/03 5:42 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Debtor Change of Mailing Address filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 02, 2015
11 11 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Mon 02/02 4:55 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice of Adjourned Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] filed by Frances A. Smith on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/5/2015 at 02:00 PM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, January 21, 2015
10 10 motion Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 01/21 4:27 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information By Presentment on February 4, 2015 at 12:00 noon filed by Rakhee V. Patel on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC Objections due by 1/30/2015,. (Patel, Rakhee)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 01/21 8:44 AM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors, Attorney Disclosure Statement. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 20, 2015
9 9 misc Rule 2016 Statement Tue 01/20 10:27 PM
Rule 2016 Statement Disclosure of Attorney Compensation for Attorney for Debtor - Shackelford, Melton, McKinley & Norton, LLP Filed by Rakhee V. Patel on behalf of Shackelford, Melton, McKinley & Norton, LLP. (Patel, Rakhee)
Related: [-]
8 8 ans Statement Tue 01/20 5:10 PM
Statement /Consolidated List of the Debtors' 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Rakhee V. Patel on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. (Patel, Rakhee)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 09, 2015
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sat 01/10 12:26 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 01/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
6 6 order Motion, Joint Administration Fri 01/09 3:51 PM
Order signed 1/9/2015 Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases of: J & B Partners Management, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island Holding Co., LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of NYDMA, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Massapequa Park, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Middle Island, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Shirley, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of Long Island II, LLC; J & B Real Estate Partners of Long Island, LLC; J & B Real Estate Partners of Long Island II, LLC; J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, J & B Partners Management, LLC, case no. 15 B 22017 (RDD) Related [+]. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-] 4
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Fri 01/09 4:14 PM
Case Joint Administration - the lead case is J & B Partners Management LLC, 15 B 22017 (RDD) (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 07, 2015
5 5 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC) Wed 01/07 1:41 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/4/2015 at 01:00 PM at Room 243A, White Plains Courthouse. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion, Joint Administration Wed 01/07 1:39 AM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Michael P. Cooley on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. (Cooley, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 01/07 12:58 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate parents added to case: J & B Restaurant Partners of NYDMA LLC. Corporate Affiliates added to case:, J & B Partners Management LLC, J & B Restaurant Partners of NY, LLC. Filed by Michael P. Cooley on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. (Cooley, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Matrix Wed 01/07 12:53 AM
Matrix Filed by Michael P. Cooley on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. (Cooley, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association -Related Wed 01/07 1:36 PM
Case Related to 14-23393 rdd J & B Restaurant Partners of NY, LLC . (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 01/07 1:39 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated:Pending Deadlines Terminated: Corp. Ownership Stmt; Cred List Needed on Dkt; Eq. Sec. Hold. List; List of All Creditors; Schedule C and Summ. of Schedules Pg 2. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 06, 2015
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 01/06 7:09 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A due 01/20/2015. Schedule B due 01/20/2015. Schedule C due 01/20/2015. Schedule D due 01/20/2015. Schedule E due 01/20/2015. Schedule F due 01/20/2015. Schedule G due 01/20/2015. Schedule H due 01/20/2015. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 01/20/2015. Summary of schedules - Page 2 (Statistical Summary) due 01/20/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/20/2015. Atty Disclosure State. due 01/20/2015. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 01/20/2015. List of all creditors due 01/20/2015. List of All Creditors Required on Case Docket in PDF Format due 01/20/2015. List of Equity Security Holders due 01/20/2015. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 01/20/2015. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 01/20/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 01/20/2015, Filed by Michael P. Cooley of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP on behalf of J & B Restaurant Partners of NJ, LLC. (Cooley, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/06 7:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-22023 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10487202. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1