6
|
|
6
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/10 10:10 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE By CLERK OF COURT, Christa K. Berry. (rmb)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement
Thu 02/05 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 2/5/15 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 3/9/2015. By DEPUTY CLERK:Robert Allen. (bfa)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 01/21 9:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH FLEMING. UNITED RECEIVABLES GROUP LLC served on 1/15/2015. (RANDALL, CHET)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Wed 01/21 12:00 PM
set Answer Deadline - Defendant was served on 1/15/15: Answer due by 2/5/2015. (mjlt)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Case Opening Filing Fee Paid
Mon 01/12 11:20 AM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1343843.), filed by JOSEPH FLEMING.(RANDALL, CHET)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/07 10:01 AM
Summons Issued as to UNITED RECEIVABLES GROUP LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 01/07 9:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/07 9:55 AM
COMPLAINT against UNITED RECEIVABLES GROUP LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD, COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CM/ECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by JOSEPH FLEMING. Fee due by 1/8/2015. (Service of Process Deadline 5/6/2015)(sfw)
Related: [-]
|