Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mitchell S Goldberg
Referred: David R Strawbridge
Case #: 2:06-cv-01833
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:May 01, 2006
Re-opened:Oct 24, 2024
Terminated:Oct 25, 2024
Defendant
BARR LABORATORIES, INC.
Defendant
CEPHALON, INC.
Defendant
CUPRIC HOLDING CO., INC.
Defendant
ECKERD CORPORATION
Defendant
MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC.
Defendant
MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD.
Defendant
RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Notice Only Party
APOTEX, INC.
Notice Only Party
BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Notice Only Party
BARRY BALACH
Notice Only Party
BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC.
Notice Only Party
CARLTON DAVIS
Notice Only Party
CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION
Notice Only Party
FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Notice Only Party
J M SMITH CORPORATION
Notice Only Party
JCG (PJC) USA, LLC
Notice Only Party
KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.
Notice Only Party
MAXI DRUG, INC.
Notice Only Party
MEIJER DISTRIBUTION, INC.
Notice Only Party
MEIJER, INC.
Notice Only Party
RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP.
Notice Only Party
RITE-AID CORPORATION
Notice Only Party
ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.
Notice Only Party
STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC.
Notice Only Party
STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY
Plaintiff
AVMED, INC.
Plaintiff
DEBRA LANGAN
Plaintiff
DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN
Plaintiff
DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH&SECURITY PLAN
Plaintiff
JEFFREY R. KRINSK
Plaintiff
PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND
Plaintiff
PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION
Plaintiff
SHIRLEY PANEBIANO
Plaintiff
VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC.
Unrepresented Party
MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

GPO Mar 29 2010
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE ANTITRUST COMPLAINTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/2010. 3/29/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
GPO Mar 29 2010
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (DOC. #86); AND "GENERIC DEFENDANTS'" MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINTS (DOC. #87) ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS ON OR BEFORE 4/19/2010; A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10:00 A.M., ON THURSDAY, 4/22/2010 IN A COURTROOM TO BE ASSIGNED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/2010. 3/29/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
GPO Mar 13 2014
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/12/2014. 3/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Mar 13 2014
ORDER THAT THE END PAYOR CLASS PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED IN THE OPION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/13/2014. 3/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Jun 23 2014
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/23/2014. 6/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Jun 23 2014
ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FILED BY CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN, AND THE MOTION FILED BY THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/23/2014. 6/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Jan 28 2015
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/2015. 1/28/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Jan 28 2015
ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/2015. 1/28/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Jun 10 2015
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/10/2015. 6/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Oct 05 2015
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/5/2015. 10/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Oct 05 2015
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' JOINT MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/5/2015. 10/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Nov 05 2015
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/5/2015. 11/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Nov 05 2015
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF MR. STONER AND DRS. COOPER AND BARANSKI ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/5/2015. 11/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Dec 14 2015
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/2015. 12/15/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Dec 14 2015
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE FRAUDULENT PATENT THEORY FROM PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/2015. 12/15/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Dec 17 2015
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/17/2015. 12/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Dec 17 2015
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON THE RULE 23(f) APPEAL IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK 06-1833 CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/17/2015. 12/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Apr 21 2020
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/20/20. 4/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
GPO Apr 21 2020
ORDERED THAT THIS COURT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER THIS ACTION AND HAS PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER EACH OF THE PARTIES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/20/20. 4/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
632 632 misc Returned Mail Wed 11/13 9:29 AM
Copy of Order/Notice dated 10/25/24 (Document # 631) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to LAWRENCE KENDALL SATTERFIELD for the following reason: VACANT. (amas)
Related: [-]