Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Lynn N Hughes
Case #: 4:15-cv-00028
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2015
Terminated:Mar 05, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 07, 2015 8:49 AM CDT
Defendant
United Airlines
Represented By
Linda P Wills
Wilson Elser Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Shivam P. Patel
1100 Langwick Drive Apt. # 714
Houston, TX 77067


Docket last updated: 03/19/2015 1:30 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 03, 2014
MOTION REFERRED: referred2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel.1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shivam Patel Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr) Modified text on 12/5/2014 (mgr).
Related: [-]
Case has been randomly Assigned to Judge David Ezra. (mgr)
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shivam Patel.(mgr) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/5/2014) (mgr).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Proposed Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed USM-285,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shivam Patel. (mgr) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/5/2014) (mgr). (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/5/2014) (mgr).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 10, 2014
3 3 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND TO SHOW CAUSE as to Shivam Patel. GRANTING1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shivam Patel. Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order why his complaint should not be dismissed or transferred. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is HELD IN ABEYANCE pending considerationof any response to this Order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg)
Related: [-]
4 4 7 pgs COMPLAINT, filed by Shivam Patel.(rg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 285-USM Form,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 16, 2014
Plaintiff's address # has been corrected - Resent doc #3 to plaintiff (rf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 29, 2014
5 5 MOTION to Transfer Venue and RESPONSE to3 Order to Show Cause by Shivam Patel. (rg) Modified on 1/7/2015, to add relief and edit text (rf).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 07, 2015
Motions No Longer Referred:2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (rf)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Transfer Venue. The Court orders this case TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 08, 2015
7 7 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 5:14-cv-01054; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice to Pauper of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (smurdock, 4)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(smurdock, 4)
Related: [-]