California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:15-cv-00108
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2015
Terminated:Nov 29, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 07, 2015 5:51 AM PDT
Defendant
County of Santa Clara
Represented By
Michael C. Serverian
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
John and Richard Doe and Roe
Defendant
Mark Evangelho, Badge No. 2073
Represented By
Michael C. Serverian
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Steven Fernandes, Badge No. 2095
Represented By
Michael C. Serverian
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Sheriff Laurie Smith
Represented By
Michael C. Serverian
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Nora Elsokkary
Represented By
Anthony Boskovich
Boskovich & Appleton
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdelhamead Ibrahim
Represented By
Anthony Boskovich
Boskovich & Appleton
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdullah Ibrahim
Represented By
Anthony Boskovich
Boskovich & Appleton
contact info
Plaintiff
Hajar Ibrahim
Represented By
Anthony Boskovich
Boskovich & Appleton
contact info

GPO Feb 10 2015
ORDER GRANTING 9 Stipulation to Extend Time for County of Santa Clara to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by County of Santa Clara. Response due 3/13/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
GPO May 18 2015
ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Accordingly, the parties' request for a continuance of the Case Management Conference to September or October is DENIED. The parties shall file a revised Joint Case Management Conference Statement which includes a proposed schedule for litigation on or before May 22, 2015. The Case Management Conference scheduled for May 21, 2015 is VACATED. ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
GPO Oct 05 2015
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiffs do not, by 10/8/2015, file or cause to be filed a Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement which conforms to the undersigned's Standing Order or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 10/8/2015 is VACATED and will be reset if necessary upon resolution of the issue addressed herein. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
GPO Oct 26 2015
Order Granting 26 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Select Date by Which Mediation Must be Completed. Deadline extended to 11/6/2015. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/26/2015..(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
GPO Jun 17 2016
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The above-entitled case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for a settlement conference to occur no later than 7/20/2016. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Cousins' Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date and time for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
GPO Jul 05 2016
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathaniel Cousins for all further proceedings pursuant to 48 Order Reassigning.Case. Hon. Howard R Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/5/201 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
GPO Jul 06 2016
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/6/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
GPO Oct 26 2016
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMARY. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/26/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
GPO Oct 30 2016
PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/30/2016. (nclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2016)
GPO Nov 09 2016
VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/9/2016. (nclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
GPO Nov 10 2016
FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/10/2016. (nclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
144 144 utility Remark Wed 01/04 12:31 PM
Receipt for Admitted Trial Exhibit. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
143 143 notice Certificate of Counsel Thu 12/29 11:46 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re Order for Destruction of Juror Questionnaires by Anthony Boskovich on behalf of Nora Elsokkary, Abdelhamead Ibrahim, Abdullah Ibrahim, Hajar Ibrahim (Boskovich, Anthony) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
Related: [-]