Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael J Mcshane
Case #: 6:15-cv-00042
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 07, 2015 5:59 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Dana Dean Altman
Represented By
Michelle B. Smigel
Miller Nash Graham & Dunn LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
University of Oregon
Represented By
Michelle B. Smigel
Miller Nash Graham & Dunn LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jane Doe
Represented By
Jennifer J. Middleton
Johnson, Johnson & Schaller
contact info
Defendant
Dana Dean Altman
Represented By
J. Michael Porter
Miller Nash Graham & Dunn LLP
contact info
Michelle B. Smigel
Miller Nash Graham & Dunn LLP
contact info
Defendant
University of Oregon
Represented By
J. Michael Porter
Miller Nash Graham & Dunn LLP
contact info
Michelle B. Smigel
Miller Nash Graham & Dunn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Jennifer J. Middleton
Johnson, Johnson & Schaller
contact info
Keith M. Edwards
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info
John C. Clune
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info


1. UO, coach face lawsuit over player assault case (registerguard.com)
Submitted Fri 01/09/2015
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
19 19 oth_doc Stipulation Tue 08/04 9:48 AM
Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal by Jane Doe. Filed by Jane Doe. (Middleton, Jennifer) Modified docket entry text on 8/4/2015 (ljb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
18 18 oth_doc Stipulation Fri 07/31 9:55 PM
Stipulation Judgment of Dismissal as to Defendant Dana Dean Altman, With Prejudice by Jane Doe. Filed by Jane Doe. (Middleton, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2015
17 17 order Protective Order Thu 06/11 4:40 PM
Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 6/10/2015 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
16 16 motion Protective Order Tue 06/09 4:24 PM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Jane Doe. (Middleton, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
15 15 minute Rule 16 Conference Tue 03/17 3:20 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held. Estimated 10 day Jury Trial is set for 5/16/2016 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 2 before Judge Michael J. McShane. Pretrial Conference is set for 5/10/2016 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 2 before Judge Michael J. McShane. Discovery is to be completed by 11/20/2015. Expert Disclosures to be completed by 1/15/2016. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/1/2016. Deadline to Amend claims or add parties is set for 9/1/2015. Status conference set for 4/7/2014 is vacated. Jennifer Middleton, Keith M Edwards, John C. Clune present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Michelle Smigel and J. Michael Porter present as counsel for defendant(s). Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. (cp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 26, 2015
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/26 4:10 PM
Amended Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by University of Oregon. (Smigel, Michelle)
Related: [-]
13 13 order 1 - Scheduling Thu 02/26 2:28 PM
Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Rule 16 Conference is set for 3/17/2015 at 01:30PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
12 12 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 02/11 3:27 PM
Notice of Appearance of J. Michael Porter appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Porter, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
11 11 attyadm Notification of New Pro Hac Vice CM/ECF Account - FORM EVENT Tue 02/10 3:25 PM
Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Keith M. Edwards (appearing Pro Hac Vice ). Your login is: kmedwards . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (ljb)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/10 3:24 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Keith M. Edwards for Jane Doe. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4001328 issued. Signed on 2/10/15 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ljb)
Related: [-]
9 9 attyadm Notification of New Pro Hac Vice CM/ECF Account - FORM EVENT Tue 02/10 3:15 PM
Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney John C. Clune (appearing Pro Hac Vice ). Your login is: jcclune . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (ljb)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/10 3:13 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John C. Clune for Jane Doe. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4001316 issued. Signed on 2/10/15 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 09, 2015
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 02/09 1:31 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Jane Doe. Filed by Dana Dean Altman, University of Oregon. (Smigel, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration
Friday, February 06, 2015
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/06 5:06 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith M. Edwards . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4001328. Filed by Jane Doe. (Middleton, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/06 5:02 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Clune . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4001316. Filed by Jane Doe. (Middleton, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
4 4 service Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service Mon 01/26 4:55 PM
Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Dana Dean Altman served on 1/22/2015; University of Oregon served on 1/22/2015 Filed by Jane Doe. (Middleton, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 12, 2015
3 3 oth_evt Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT Mon 01/12 11:19 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Ann L. Aiken to Judge Michael J. McShane. (eo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 09, 2015
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 01/09 9:06 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/11/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/8/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 6/8/2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued
Thursday, January 08, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/08 2:57 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3964180 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jane Doe against Dana Dean Altman, University of Oregon. (Middleton, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons University of Oregon,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Dana Dean Altman