Chinook USA, LLC
Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Alan C Stout |
Case #: | 3:15-bk-30057 |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Chinook USA, LLC
9509 US Highway 42 Ste 106
Prospect, KY 40059-9291 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
US Trustee
Asst. U.S.Trustee
Office of the U.S.Trustee 601 West Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202 |
1. | ?Duck Dynasty' Iced Tea Maker Blames Show's Stars for Bankruptcy (blogs.wsj.com) |
Submitted Tue 01/13/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 12:01 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
188 | 188
court
Final Decree and Close Case
Thu 02/18 10:23 AM
Final Decree, discharging trustee, if applicable, and canceling bond. CASE CLOSED. (Smithson, M) |