Alabama Northern District Court
Judge:Sharon Lovelace Blackburn
Case #: 2:15-cv-00015
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2015
Terminated:Jun 17, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Jul 05, 2015 6:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Hooters of Trussville LLC
Represented By
Tammy L Baker
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jodi Lee
Represented By
Daniel E Arciniegas
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher & Goldfarb
contact info
Jon C Goldfarb
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher & Goldfarb
contact info
Rachel L McGinley
Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis LLC
contact info
L William Smith
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher & Goldfarb
contact info
Plaintiff
Brooke Pearman
Represented By
Daniel E Arciniegas
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher & Goldfarb
contact info
Jon C Goldfarb
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher & Goldfarb
contact info
Rachel L McGinley
Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis LLC
contact info
L William Smith
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher & Goldfarb
contact info

GPO Jun 17 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 6/17/15. (MRR)
Docket last updated: 01/15/2015 4:41 PM CST
Tuesday, January 06, 2015
NOTICE that the filing fee may now be paid electronically. (CTS, )
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Hooters of Trussville LLC w/ Jury Demand, filed by Brooke Pearman, Jodi Lee.(CTS, )
Related: [-]
2 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jodi Lee, Brooke Pearman. (CTS, )
Related: [-]