New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sandra J Feuerstein
Referred: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Case #: 2:11-cv-03211
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2011
Terminated:Aug 17, 2011
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2017 5:30 AM EST
Defendant
109 Foods, Inc.
Defendant
318 Foods, Inc.
Defendant
347 Foods, Inc.
Defendant
Philip Giunta
Defendant
Giunta's Meat Farms, Inc.
Defendant
Peter Levantino
Plaintiff
Hilda L. Solis
Represented By
Patricia M. Rodenhausen
U.S. Department Of Labor
contact info
Harold William LeMar
Harrison Harrison & Associates, Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/04/2011 8:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 05, 2011
Summons Issued as to 109 Foods, Inc., 318 Foods, Inc., 347 Foods, Inc., Philip Giunta, Giunta's Meat Farms, Inc., Peter Levantino. (Romano, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 109 Foods, Inc., 318 Foods, Inc., 347 Foods, Inc., Philip Giunta, Giunta's Meat Farms, Inc., Peter Levantino Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Hilda L. Solis. (Romano, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet