New York Southern District Court
Judge:Shira A Scheindlin
Case #: 1:11-cv-05042
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2011
Terminated:Dec 21, 2011
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2017 8:17 PM EST
Defendant
Diversified Consultants, Inc.
Plaintiff
Klajdi Plasari
Represented By
Allison Diana Polesky
Law Offices Of Allison Polesky, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, December 21, 2011
8 8 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for all the parties to the above entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, that the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued with prejudice and without costs to any party as against any other party. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/20/2011) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2011
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Allison Polesky Document7 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for approval. (dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2011
7 7 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Diversified Consultants, Inc. and WITH costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Klajdi Plasari.(Polesky, Allison) Modified on 12/20/2011 (dt).
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2011
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Allison Polesky to RE-FILE Document6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,. Use the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Filings, then Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. (dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2011
6 6 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELCTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Diversified Consultants, Inc.. Document filed by Klajdi Plasari. (Polesky, Allison) Modified on 12/16/2011 (dt).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2011
5 5 STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Diversified Consultants, Inc. answer due 10/7/2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/26/2011) (cd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2011
4 4 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/15/2011) (tro)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2011
3 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: The time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be adjourned until September 26, 2011. Diversified Consultants, Inc. answer due 9/26/2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/26/2011) (rdz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2011
2 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Diversified Consultants, Inc. served on 8/3/2011, answer due 8/24/2011. Service was accepted by Mavis Pye, Registered Agent. Document filed by Klajdi Plasari. (Polesky, Allison)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2011
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Allison Diana Polesky for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document1 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (rdz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2011
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT against Diversified Consultants, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 12237)Document filed by Klajdi Plasari.(ama) (ama).
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diversified Consultants, Inc. (ama)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (ama)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (ama)
Related: [-]