13
|
|
13
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 3 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 6/4/2015.(nm)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 3 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 6/3/2015. (nm)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Based upon the Notice of Substitution and Dismissal [Docket No. 10] filed by the Petitioner on August 12, 2014, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and without costs or disbursements to any party. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/12/2014) (lmb)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Loring I. Fenton, New Attorney: Andrew N. Goldman, Address: Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, 7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street, New York, New York, New York 10007, (212) 230-8800. Document filed by Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc.. (Goldman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ORDER: Accordingly, because this action is stayed as a matter of law, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court place this case on this Court's suspense docket. Counsel are directed to provide Chambers with status updates of the bankruptcy proceeding when they become available. Petitioner is directed to forward a copy of this Order to respondent, forthwith. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/29/2011) (laq)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Bionol Clearfield, LLC. Document filed by Proposed Counsel for Alfred Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee of Bionol Clearfield, LLC(Morain, Malinda)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Petition & Petition to Vacate Final Arbitration Award with Exhibits; Memo of Law in Support of Petition; Declaration of Timothy J. Fazio in Support of Petition with Exhibits; Application to File Under Seal; Timothy J. Fazio Declaration in Support of Fiilng Under Seal with Exhibits; Order to File Under Seal; Rule 7.1 Statement and Civil Cover Sheet served on Defendant Bionol Clearfield LLC on 7/25/2011. Service was accepted by Joshua T. Klein, Esq. of Fox Rothschild LLP. Service was made by Federal Express overnight mail. Document filed by Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc.. (Fenton, Loring)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
NOTICE of Petition to Vacate Final Arbitration Award re: 1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc.. (Fenton, Loring)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Cambridge Petroleum Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc.(ama)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1012336).Document filed by Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc.(ama)(SEALED DOCUMENT)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (ama)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case Designated ECF. (ama)
Related: [-]
|