Connecticut District Court
Judge:Alvin W Thompson
Case #: 3:15-cv-00056
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2015
Terminated:Mar 16, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Oct 04, 2015 8:59 AM EDT
Defendant
Colleen Ann Reidy
Represented By
Joseph W. McQuade
Kainen, Escalera & Mchale, PC
contact info
Defendant
Thompsonville Fire Dist #2
Represented By
Joseph W. McQuade
Kainen, Escalera & Mchale, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Francis Alaimo
Represented By
Gary Edward Phelan
Mitchell & Sheahan, P.C.
contact info
Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner
Mitchell & Sheahan, P.C.
contact info

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
46 46 order Order Wed 04/27 7:12 PM
ORDER: Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. No.45 ) is hereby GRANTED. This case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. The Clerk shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/27/2016. (Calle, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2016
45 45 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/25 1:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Colleen Ann Reidy, Thompsonville Fire Dist #2. (McQuade, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
44 44 order Order Wed 03/16 9:41 AM
ORDER: The parties have reported settlement. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before April 29, 2016, as set forth in the attached order. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/15/16. (Mata, E.)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 03/25 6:20 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
43 43 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 03/16 8:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Settlement Conference held on 3/15/2016. Total Time 2 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.) (Nuzzi, T)
Related: [-]
42 42 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 03/15 2:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Continued Settlement Conference held on 3/15/2016. Case reported settled. Total Time: 4 hours. (Katz, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
41 41 utility Calendar Entry Tue 02/23 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A continued Settlement Conference will be conducted in this matter on March 15, 2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom Five, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT, before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. All parties in attendance at the February 22, 2016, conference shall attend the March 15, 2016, conference. The parties shall submit ex parte updates regarding the status of settlement negotiations on or before March 10, 2016, by the method described in the Settlement Conference Order.37 SO ORDERED. (Kaczmarek, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2016
40 40 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 02/22 5:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2016. Total Time: 4 hours. (Kaczmarek, S.)
Related: [-]
39 39 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 02/22 4:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2016. Total Time 8 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.) (Nuzzi, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2016
38 38 utility Calendar Entry Mon 02/01 3:10 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom Five, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam (Nuzzi, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2016
37 37 order Order Fri 01/29 11:41 AM
ORDER. The attached Order sets forth detailed instructions and deadlines for a settlement conference scheduled in this case. All counsel must read the attached order and provide a copy to their clients. Compliance with all deadlines and conditions set forth in the Order is mandatory . Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 1/29/16.(Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
36 36 utility Calendar Entry Fri 01/29 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 1/29/2016 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom Five, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam (Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
35 35 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 01/29 10:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Settlement Conference held on 1/29/2016. 10 minutes. A settlement conference is scheduled for February 22, 2016 at 1:00 PM. A separate conference order and calendar will issue. (Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
34 34 utility Calendar Entry Fri 01/22 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This case has been referred to Judge Merriam for a settlement conference. She will hold a pre-conference telephone call with counsel on Friday, January 29, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. A firm date for the settlement conference will be set during that telephone call. The Court requires parties and insurance representatives with full settlement authority to attend the settlement conference. Therefore, counsel must consult with their clients prior to the telephone call to determine any dates on which they will be unavailable in the next 90 days. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to facilitate scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer, who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. Counsel are requested to use the following dial-in for this call: (641)715-3580; Access Code: 841-802.(Merriam, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
33 33 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/22 9:43 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for a Settlement Conference to be scheduled as soon as possible on or after February 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/21/16.(Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order Thu 01/21 6:03 PM
ORDER: Joint Status Report (Doc. No.31 ) is hereby APPROVED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/21/2016. (Calle, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
31 31 misc Status Report Fri 01/15 2:35 PM
STATUS REPORT by Francis Alaimo. (Phelan, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
30 30 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/21 12:55 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Colleen Ann Reidy, Thompsonville Fire Dist #2.(McQuade, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2015
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/17 2:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Francis Alaimo.(Phelan, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
28 28 ORDER: Motion to Amend/Correct9 Amended Complaint (Doc. No.27 ) is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint forthwith. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/10/15. (Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2015
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Fri 09/04 3:44 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct9 Amended Complaint by Francis Alaimo.Responses due by 9/25/2015(Phelan, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint
Friday, June 12, 2015
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 06/12 5:28 PM
ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No.25 ) is hereby GRANTED, absent objection. The defendants shall have 30 days after the filing of the second amended complaint to answer or otherwise respond. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2015. (Wang, M.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2015
25 25 motion Extension of Time Wed 06/10 3:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days to Answer Amended Complaint by Colleen Ann Reidy, Thompsonville Fire Dist #2. (McQuade, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
24 24 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 06/09 7:25 PM
ORDER: Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No.13 ) is hereby DENIED and the docket shall reflect that Count Four of the Amended Complaint has been withdrawn as to Thompsonville Fire District #2. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/9/2015. (Wang, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
23 23 order Order Fri 06/05 1:24 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report on January 15, 2016. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/5/2015.(Wang, M.)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order Fri 06/05 1:21 PM
ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Doc. No.17 ) is hereby APPROVED. All discovery shall be completed by May 31, 2016. Dispositive motions shall be filed by July 15, 2016. All other dates requested in this report are also approved. A trial memorandum order will be issued once the dispositive motions deadline has passed. REMINDER: please refer to the electronic filing order in civil cases re: the requirements for submission of chambers copies. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/5/2015.(Wang, M.)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Status Conference Fri 06/05 1:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin W. Thompson: Telephonic Status Conference re 26(f) report held on 6/5/2015. Time: 6 minutes. (Wang, M.)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/05 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner on behalf of Francis Alaimo (Garcia Quintner, Maria)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/09 4:07 PM
Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/31/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2016. (Smith, S.)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/09 4:09 PM
Set Deadline: Status Report due by 1/15/2016 (Smith, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2015
19 19 utility Calendar Entry Thu 05/28 7:41 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/5/2015 at 01:00 PM before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-3224 with opposing counsel on the line. (Wang, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2015
18 18 respm Response Fri 05/22 2:53 PM
RESPONSE re16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Colleen Ann Reidy, Thompsonville Fire Dist #2. (McQuade, Joseph)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 05/22 12:10 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McQuade, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2015
16 16 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/20 3:17 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Francis Alaimo.(Phelan, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unreported Decision
Thursday, May 14, 2015
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 05/14 6:21 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for a 5-Day Extension to Respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No.14 ) is hereby GRANTED, absent objection, until May 20, 2015. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/14/2015. (Wang, M.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 05/13 3:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss until 05/20/2015 by Francis Alaimo. (Phelan, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2015
13 13 motion Dismiss Fri 04/24 4:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Colleen Ann Reidy, Thompsonville Fire Dist #2.Responses due by 5/15/2015(McQuade, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/24 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. McQuade on behalf of Colleen Ann Reidy, Thompsonville Fire Dist #2 (McQuade, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2015
11 11 order Order Tue 03/31 5:14 PM
ORDER RE: INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/31/2015.(Smith, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2015
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/30 1:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Colleen Ann Reidy waiver sent on 2/25/2015, answer due 4/24/2015; Thompsonville Fire Dist #2 waiver sent on 2/25/2015, answer due 4/24/2015 filed by Francis Alaimo. (Phelan, Gary) Modified on 3/30/2015 to correct waiver sent and answer due dates (Sundie, T).
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 03/30 2:28 PM
Answer deadline updated for Colleen Ann Reidy to 4/24/2015; Thompsonville Fire Dist #2 to 4/24/2015. (Sundie, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 18, 2015
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/18 11:58 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Francis Alaimo.(Phelan, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 02/17 6:53 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion under Fed. Rule Civ. 15(a) to Amend His Complaint as of Right (Doc. No.7 ) is hereby GRANTED. The amended complaint shall be filed forthwith. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/17/2015. (Wang, M.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 12, 2015
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Thu 02/12 3:48 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Francis Alaimo.Responses due by 3/5/2015(Phelan, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
Wednesday, January 14, 2015
6 6 order Electronic Service Documents Wed 01/14 3:00 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of3 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint filed by Francis Alaimo,5 Notice Re Initial Discovery Protocols2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 1/14/15.(Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 13, 2015
5 5 notice Notice Wed 01/14 2:55 PM
NOTICE Re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 1/13/15.(Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Discovery Attachment
4 4 order Protective Order Wed 01/14 2:53 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/13/15.(Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 01/14 2:52 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/13/15.(Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Wed 01/14 2:49 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 4/13/15. Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2015. Discovery due by 7/15/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2015. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/15.(Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3477368.), filed by Francis A. Alaimo.(Phelan, Gary)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/14 8:29 AM
Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Walker, J.)
Related: [-]