Ruff v. Butler
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David L Bunning |
Referred: | P So |
Case #: | 6:15-cv-00006 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2016 |
Petitioner
Kevin A. Ruff
|
|
Respondent
S. Butler
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 08/08 11:11 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to12 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kevin A. Ruff(RBB) |
|
Att: 1 6CCA Cover Letter | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Information Copy of Order/Judgment
Fri 06/16 2:14 PM
INFORMATION COPY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT of USCA as to12 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kevin A. Ruff Appeal: Affirmed district court's judgment and Grant the motion to proceed IFP.(KJA) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter (Mandate to Issue) | ||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Order
Tue 01/03 9:39 AM
ORDER: 1. Warden Butler's Motion to Supplement Record (Doc. #15 ) is DENIED; and 2. The Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/03/2017. (KJA) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
For Order
Thu 12/22 11:42 AM
MOTION for Order by S. Butler to Supplement the Record Motions referred to P SO.(Osborn, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Email correspondence between Teresa Tom and Jose Santana, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Thu 12/22 2:42 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PRO SE for review: re15 MOTION for Order by S. Butler to Supplement the Record (RC) |
||
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Wed 05/04 8:31 AM
ORDER: (1) Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A), the Court CERTIFIES that the Notice of Appeal [R.12 ] filed by Petitioner-Appellant Kevin A. Ruff was not taken in good faith. (2) W/in (30) days of the doe of this Order, Ruff must either (a) pay the $505.00 appellate filing fee to the Clerk of this Court, or (b) file a properly supported motion in the 6CCA seeking permission to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(1). If Ruff fails to take either of these steps, the 6CCA may dismiss his appeal. (3) A certificate of appealability is NOT necessary in this 28 U.S.C. § 2241 proceeding. (4) The Clerk of this Court shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Clerk 6CCA, referencing Case No. 16-5565 Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 05/03/2016.(KJA) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Letter
Fri 04/29 4:24 PM
LETTER from 6CCA to Kevin Ruff. Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability pending in District Court. (KJA) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 04/29 4:16 PM
USCA Case Number 16-5565 Case Manager Louise Schwarber for12 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kevin A. Ruff. (KJA) |
||
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 04/28 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to11 Judgment,,10 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by Kevin A. Ruff, Pro Se. cc: COR, 6CCA. Short record mailed to pro se filer (notice of appeal, docket sheet, and Order and Judgment).(KJA) |
|
Att: 1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 04/26/2016 | ||
utility
File Submitted
Thu 04/28 3:19 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:12 Notice of Appeal, as to11 Judgment,10 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by Kevin A. Ruff, Pro Se. ***No filing fee received. (KJA) |
||
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Wed 04/13 10:48 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered today, pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that: (1) Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Respondent Sandra Butler, Warden of the Federal Correctional Institution located in Manchester, Kentucky, with respect to all issues asserted herein. (2) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE ORDER and there is no just cause for delay. (3) The Court CERTIFIES that any appeal would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 04/13/2016.(KJA) |
|
10 | 10
24
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Wed 04/13 10:46 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Petitioner Kevin Antonio Ruff's 28 U.S.C. § 2241 petition for a writ of habeas corpus [R.1 ] is DENIED and the Court will enter an appropriate Judgment. 2. This matter is STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 04/13/2016.(KJA) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/09 12:59 PM
ORDER: (1) Respondent's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED, nunc pro tunc to July 10, 2015; and (2) This matter stands submitted for further consideration. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 09/09/2015. (KJA) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Tue 08/11 2:23 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by S. Butler (KJA) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
utility
File Submitted
Tue 07/28 3:23 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by S. Butler (KJA) |
||
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Response
Tue 07/21 2:35 PM
RESPONSE to1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by S. Butler.(Osborn, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF GRACE WOODS-COLEMAN AND ITS ATTACHMENTS PART ONE, | ||
Att: 2 DECLARATION OF GRACE WOODS-COLEMAN AND ITS ATTACHMENTS PART TWO, | ||
Att: 3 DECLARATION OF GRACE WOODS-COLEMAN AND ITS ATTACHMENTS PART THREE, | ||
Att: 4 DECLARATION OF GRACE WOODS-COLEMAN AND ITS ATTACHMENTS PART FOUR, | ||
Att: 5 DECLARATION OF GRACE WOODS-COLEMAN AND ITS ATTACHMENTS PART FIVE, | ||
Att: 6 DECLARATION OF GRACE WOODS-COLEMAN AND ITS ATTACHMENTS PART SIX, | ||
Att: 7 DECLARATION OF GRACE WOODS-COLEMAN AND ITS ATTACHMENTS PART SEVEN, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/10 9:38 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by S. Butler Motions referred to P SO.(Osborn, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Thu 06/04 11:38 AM
Letter from Kevin Ruff, Pro Se. ***Clerk mailed pro se filer a current copy of docket sheet and copy of receipt received on 1/30/2015. (KJA) |
|
Att: 1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 06/02/2015 | ||
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 06/01 9:14 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re3 Order, as to U.S. Attorney General. (KJA) |
|
utility
File Submitted
Mon 06/01 9:16 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:5 Certified Mail Receipt re3 Order, as to U.S. Attorney General. (KJA) |
||
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Wed 05/20 1:30 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re3 Order, as to Sandra Butler, Warder and U.S. Attorney EDKy. (KJA) |
|
utility
File Submitted
Wed 05/20 1:37 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:4 Certified Mail Receipt re3 Order, as to Sandra Butler, Warder and U.S. Attorney EDKy. (KJA) |
||
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/15 11:12 AM
ORDER: (1) The Clerk shall SEND a copy of the petition [R.1 ] and this Order by certified mail to (a) respondent Sandra Butler, Warden of FCI-Manchester, (b) the Attorney General for the United States, and (c) the United States Attorney for the EDKy. (2) NLT 7/11/2015, the respondent shall FILE a response to Ruff's petition, R.1 , showing cause why the writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 2243. Respondent shall also file all relevant documentary evidence that bears upon the allegations in the petition. The response may address either the merits of Ruffs petition or alternative grounds for dismissal, such as lack of administrative exhaustion. Should the respondent choose the latter option, the Court will review these grounds before setting a new deadline for a comprehensive response to the merits of Ruff's petition. (3) Ruff must NOTIFY the Clerk of any changes in his mailing address. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 05/15/2015.(KJA)cc: COR, paper copy to pro se filer, Sandra Butler, Attorney General, US Attorney EDKy via certified mail (KJA) |
|
Att: 1 (5/15/2015) Copy of Certified Mail Envelopes | ||
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Prisoner Receipts
Fri 01/30 12:53 PM
Prisoner Receipt For ORIGINAL Filing Fee; Receipt Number 6005271; Balance $ 5; Amt Pd 5; Balance Due $0 (KJA) |
|
utility
File Submitted
Fri 01/30 12:54 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:2 Prisoner Receipts (KJA) |
||
Wednesday, January 14, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 01/14 2:29 PM
PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin A. Ruff.(KJA) |
|
Att: 1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 01/12/2015, | ||
Att: 2 Case Assignment | ||
notice
Redaction Policy Notice
Wed 01/14 2:29 PM
IMPORTANT NOTICE - PRIVACY RULES and REDACTION POLICY: F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requires that personal identification information must be partially redacted from documents filed with the court.[LINK:Click here for more information on the rules.] It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. cc: COR, mailed paper copy to pro se filer (KJA) |
||
misc
Conflict Check
Wed 01/14 2:29 PM
Conflict Check run. (KJA) |
||
utility
File Submitted
Wed 01/14 2:31 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:1 PRO SE Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (KJA) |