Prevec et al v. Narconon Freedom Center, Inc. et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00037 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 13, 2015 10:40 AM EDT |
defendant
Association for Better Living and Education International
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Narconon Eastern United States
|
|
defendant
Narconon Freedom Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Narconon International
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Unknown Part(y)(ies) #1
|
|
defendant
Unknown Part(y)(ies) #2
|
|
plaintiff
Frank Prevec
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jannette Prevec
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lauren Prevec
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 23, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER granting STIPULATION16 dismissing matter without prejudice and without costs to either party ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) |
|
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE to attorney Jeffrey Ray regarding recent filing16 (pjw) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Frank Prevec, Jannette Prevec, Lauren Prevec (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents)
Thu 04/23 12:50 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal (as taken from 16 ) by plaintiffs Frank Prevec, Jannette Prevec, Lauren Prevec (pjw) |
||
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER directing Clerk of Court make a change to the court record to reflect that Kathleen H. Klaus does not represent Defendant Narconon Eastern United States; plaintiff not later than 4/17/2015 apply for a Clerk's entry of default against Defendant Narconon Eastern United States, or show cause why Defendant Narconon Eastern should not be dismissed without prejudice; dismissing as moot in part and denying without prejudice in all other respects defendant's motions to dismiss9 10 ; the parties brief the issues on the subject matter jurisdiction of this Court no later than 4/30/2015; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Judge Robert J. Jonker, mil) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
![]() JOINT STATUS REPORT (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE to attorney Jeffrey Ray regarding recent filing11 (pjw) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Plaintiff's First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jannette Prevec, Lauren Prevec, Frank Prevec (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Friday, March 06, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) by defendant Narconon Freedom Center, Inc.;(Klaus, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2) by defendants Association for Better Living and Education International, Narconon International; (Klaus, Kathleen) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 03/06 1:44 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kathleen H. Klaus on behalf of defendants Association for Better Living and Education International, Narconon Eastern United States, Narconon Freedom Center, Inc., Narconon International (Klaus, Kathleen) |
||
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER granting STIPULATION5 for service and response date ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/3/2015 at 4:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 3/30/2015 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) |
|
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS returned executed; Narconon Eastern United States served on 1/21/2015, answer due 2/11/2015 (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, February 13, 2015 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/13 10:47 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Harvey R. Heller on behalf of defendants Association for Better Living and Education International, Narconon Freedom Center, Inc., Narconon International (Heller, Harvey) |
||
Thursday, February 12, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Concerning Service and Response Date by defendants Association for Better Living and Education International, Narconon Freedom Center, Inc., Narconon International [Attorney Kathleen H. Klaus added to party Association for Better Living and Education International(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen H. Klaus added to party Narconon Freedom Center, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen H. Klaus added to party Narconon International(pty:dft)] (Klaus, Kathleen) |
|
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Association for Better Living and Education International, Narconon Eastern United States, Narconon Freedom Center, Inc., Narconon International (jlg) |
|
Thursday, January 15, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
![]() PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1(Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Robert J. Jonker (pjw) |
|
service
Summons Not Issued
Thu 01/15 12:12 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Association for Better Living and Education International, Narconon Eastern United States, Narconon Freedom Center, Inc., Narconon International, Unknown Part(y)(ies) #1, Unknown Part(y)(ies) #2 (none provided) (pjw) |
||
Wednesday, January 14, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Lauren Prevec(Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Wed 01/14 2:48 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Lauren Prevec in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3093508 (Ray, Jeffrey) |