Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-01145

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:A Benjamin Goldgar
Case #: 1:15-bk-01209
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2015
Terminated:Dec 19, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Durante Holdings, LLC
1 Caesars Palace Dr
Las Vegas, NV 89109-8969
Represented By
David R Seligman
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
7 7 court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 12/19 2:52 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (Gonzalez, Maribel)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Final Decree Wed 12/19 12:04 PM
Final Decree . Signed on 12/19/2018 (Gonzalez, Maribel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 15, 2015
5 5 order Joint Administration Fri 01/16 7:49 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc. 15-01145 with Member Cases(s) 190 Flamingo, LLC (Case No. 15-01263 ; 3535 LV Corp. (Case No. 15-01146 ; 3535 LV Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01149 ; AJP Holdings, LLC (Case No. 15-01297 ; AJP Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01264 ; B I Gaming Corporation (Case No. 15-01147 ; Ballys Las Vegas Manager, LLC (Case No. 15-01265 ; Ballys Midwest Casino, Inc. (Case No. 15-01315 ; Ballys Park Place, Inc. (Case No. 15-01148 ; Benco, Inc. (Case No. 15-01152 ; Biloxi Hammond, LLC (Case No. 15-01156 ; Biloxi Village Walk Development, LLC (Case No. 15-01208 ; BL Development Corp. (Case No. 15-01150 ; Boardwalk Regency Corporation (Case No. 15-01151 ; BPP Providence Acquisition Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01180 ; Caesars Air, LLC (Case No. 15-01267 ; Caesars Baltimore Acquisition Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01268 ; Caesars Baltimore Development Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01183 ; Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01165 ; Caesars Entertainment Canada Holding, Inc. (Case No. 15-01158 ; Caesars Entertainment Finance Corp. (Case No. 15-01153 ; Caesars Entertainment Golf, Inc. (Case No. 15-01154 ; Caesars Entertainment Retail, Inc. (Case No. 15-01157 ; Caesars Entertainment Windsor Limited (Case No. 15-01190 ; Caesars Escrow Corporation (Case No. 15-01155 ; Caesars India Sponsor Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01194 ; Caesars License Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01199 ; Caesars Marketing Services Corporation (Case No. 15-01203 ; Caesars Massachusetts Acquisition Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01270 ; Caesars Massachusetts Development Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01166 ; Caesars Massachusetts Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01168 ; Caesars Massachusetts Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01170 ; Caesars New Jersey, Inc. (Case No. 15-01159 ; Caesars Operating Escrow LLC (Case No. 15-01272 ; Caesars Palace Corporation (Case No. 15-01161 ; Caesars Palace Realty Corp. (Case No. 15-01164 ; Caesars Palace Sports Promotions, Inc. (Case No. 15-01169 ; Caesars Riverboat Casino, LLC (Case No. 15-01172 ; Caesars Trex, Inc. (Case No. 15-01171 ; Caesars United Kingdom, Inc. (Case No. 15-01174 ; Caesars World Marketing Corporation (Case No. 15-01176 ; Caesars World Merchandising, Inc. (Case No. 15-01160 ; Caesars World, Inc. (Case No. 15-01173 ; California Clearing Corporation (Case No. 15-01177 ; Casino Computer Programming, Inc. (Case No. 15-01162 ; CG Services, LLC (Case No. 15-01179 ; Chester Facility Holding Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01313 ; Christian County Land Acquisition Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01274 ; Consolidated Supplies, Services and Systems (Case No. 15-01163 ; Corner Investment Company Newco, LLC (Case No. 15-01275 ; Cromwell Manager, LLC (Case No. 15-01276 ; CZL Development Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01278 ; CZL Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01279 ; DCH Exchange, LLC (Case No. 15-01281 ; DCH Lender, LLC (Case No. 15-01282 ; Des Plaines Development Limited Partnership (Case No. 15-01144 ; Desert Palace, Inc. (Case No. 15-01167 ; Durante Holdings, LLC (Case No. 15-01209 ; East Beach Development Corporation (Case No. 15-01175 ; FHR Corporation (Case No. 15-01178 ; FHR Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01212 ; Flamingo-Laughlin Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01216 ; Flamingo-Laughlin, Inc. (Case No. 15-01219 ; GCA Acquisition Subsidiary, Inc. (Case No. 15-01181 ; GNOC, Corp. (Case No. 15-01184 ; Grand Casinos of Biloxi, LLC (Case No. 15-01221 ; Grand Casinos of Mississippi, LLC - Gulfport (Case No. 15-01223 ; Grand Casinos, Inc. (Case No. 15-01186 ; Grand Media Buying, Inc. (Case No. 15-01187 ; Harrah South Shore Corporation (Case No. 15-01224 ; Harrahs Arizona Corporation (Case No. 15-01213 ; Harrahs Bossier City Investment Company, L.L.C. (Case No. 15-01218 ; Harrahs Bossier City Management Company, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Case No. 15-01220 ; Harrahs Chester Downs Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01283 ; Harrahs Chester Downs Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01314 ; Harrahs Illinois Corporation (Case No. 15-01182 ; Harrahs Interactive Investment Company (Case No. 15-01189 ; Harrahs International Holding Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01192 ; Harrahs Investments, Inc. (Case No. 15-01193 ; Harrahs Iowa Arena Management, LLC (Case No. 15-01284 ; Harrahs Management Company (Case No. 15-01195 ; Harrahs Maryland Heights Operating Company (Case No. 15-01286 ; Harrahs MH Project, LLC (Case No. 15-01288 ; Harrahs NC Casino Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01280 ; Harrahs New Orleans Management Company (Case No. 15-01222 ; Harrahs North Kansas City LLC (Case No. 15-01266 ; Harrahs Operating Company Memphis, LLC (Case No. 15-01269 ; Harrahs Pittsburgh Management Company (Case No. 15-01197 ; Harrahs Reno Holding Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01198 ; Harrahs Shreveport Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01225 ; Harrahs Shreveport Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01185 ; Harrahs Shreveport/Bossier City Holding Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01188 ; Harrahs Shreveport/Bossier City Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01262 ; Harrahs Southwest Michigan Casino Corporation (Case No. 15-01201 ; Harrahs Travel, Inc. (Case No. 15-01202 ; Harrahs West Warwick Gaming Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01271 ; Harveys BR Management Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01204 ; Harveys C.C. Management Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01205 ; Harveys Iowa Management Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01206 ; Harveys Tahoe Management Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01191 ; H-BAY, LLC (Case No. 15-01273 ; HBR Realty Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01207 ; HCAL, LLC (Case No. 15-01196 ; HCR Services Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01210 ; HEI Holding Company One, Inc. (Case No. 15-01211 ; HEI Holding Company Two, Inc. (Case No. 15-01214 ; HHLV Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01277 ; HIE Holdings Topco, Inc. (Case No. 15-01215 ; Hole in the Wall, LLC (Case No. 15-01285 ; Horseshoe Entertainment (Case No. 15-01200 ; Horseshoe Gaming Holding, LLC (Case No. 15-01227 ; Horseshoe GP, LLC (Case No. 15-01230 ; Horseshoe Hammond, LLC (Case No. 15-01232 ; Horseshoe Shreveport, L.L.C. (Case No. 15-01233 ; HTM Holding, Inc. (Case No. 15-01217 ; JCC Holding Company II Newco, LLC (Case No. 15-01287 ; Koval Holdings Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01289 ; Koval Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01235 ; Las Vegas Golf Management, LLC (Case No. 15-1237 ; Las Vegas Resort Development, Inc. (Case No. 15-01231 ; Laundry Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01239 ; LVH Corporation (Case No. 15-01234 ; LVH Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01241 ; Martial Development Corp. (Case No. 15-01236 ; Nevada Marketing, LLC (Case No. 15-01290 ; New Gaming Capital Partnership, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Case No. 15-01244 ; Ocean Showboat, Inc. (Case No. 15-01238 ; Octavius Linq Holding Co., LLC (Case No. 15-01246 ; Parball Corporation (Case No. 15-01240 ; Parball Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01248 ; PH Employees Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01249 ; PHW Investments, LLC (Case No. 15-01291 ; PHW Las Vegas, LLC (Case No. 15-01251 ; PHW Manager, LLC (Case No. 15-01312 ; Players Bluegrass Downs, Inc. (Case No. 15-01242 ; Players Development, Inc. (Case No. 15-01253 ; Players Holding, LLC (Case No. 15-01255 ; Players International, LLC (Case No. 15-01292 ; Players LC, LLC (Case No. 15-01307 ; Players Maryland Heights Nevada, LLC (Case No. 15-01257 ; Players Resources, Inc. (Case No. 15-01243 ; Players Riverboat II, LLC (Case No. 15-01309 ; Players Riverboat Management, LLC (Case No. 15-01226 ; Players Riverboat, LLC (Case No. 15-01228 ; Players Services, Inc. (Case No. 15-01229 ; Reno Crossroads LLC (Case No. 15-01293 ; Reno Projects, Inc. (Case No. 15-01245 ; Rio Development Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01247 ; Robinson Property Group Corp. (Case No. 15-01250 ; Roman Entertainment Corporation of Indiana (Case No. 15-01252 ; Roman Holding Corporation of Indiana (Case No. 15-01254 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 1, LLC (Case No. 15-01295 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 2, LLC (Case No. 15-01296 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 3, LLC (Case No. 15-01298 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 4, LLC (Case No. 15-01300 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 5, LLC (Case No. 15-01302 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 6, LLC (Case No. 15-01303 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 7, LLC (Case No. 15-01305 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 8, LLC (Case No. 15-01306 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 9, LLC (Case No. 15-01308 ; Showboat Atlantic City Operating Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01256 ; Showboat Atlantic City Propco, LLC (Case No. 15-01258 ; Showboat Holding, Inc. (Case No. 15-01261 ; Southern Illinois Riverboat/Casino Cruises, Inc. (Case No. 15-01143 ; Tahoe Garage Propco, LLC (Case No. 15-01310 ; The Quad Manager, LLC (Case No. 15-01294 ; TRB Flamingo, LLC (Case No. 15-01299 ; Trigger Real Estate Corporation (Case No. 15-01259 ; Tunica Roadhouse Corporation (Case No. 15-01260 ; Village Walk Construction, LLC (Case No. 15-01304 ; Winnick Holdings, LLC (Case No. 15-01311 ; Winnick Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01301 Related [+]. Signed on 1/15/2015. (Ross, Demetrius)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Thu 01/15 11:42 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by David R Seligman on behalf of Durante Holdings, LLC. (Seligman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Joint Administration Thu 01/15 11:38 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01145 with Member Case(s) 190 Flamingo, LLC (Case No. 15-01263 ; 3535 LV Corp. (Case No. 15-01146 ; 3535 LV Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01149 ; AJP Holdings, LLC (Case No. 15-01297 ; AJP Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01264 ; B I Gaming Corporation (Case No. 15-01147 ; Ballys Las Vegas Manager, LLC (Case No. 15-01265 ; Ballys Midwest Casino, Inc. (Case No. 15-01315 ; Ballys Park Place, Inc. (Case No. 15-01148 ; Benco, Inc. (Case No. 15-01152 ; Biloxi Hammond, LLC (Case No. 15-01156 ; Biloxi Village Walk Development, LLC (Case No. 15-01208 ; BL Development Corp. (Case No. 15-01150 ; Boardwalk Regency Corporation (Case No. 15-01151 ; BPP Providence Acquisition Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01180 ; Caesars Air, LLC (Case No. 15-01267 ; Caesars Baltimore Acquisition Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01268 ; Caesars Baltimore Development Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01183 ; Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01165 ; Caesars Entertainment Canada Holding, Inc. (Case No. 15-01158 ; Caesars Entertainment Finance Corp. (Case No. 15-01153 ; Caesars Entertainment Golf, Inc. (Case No. 15-01154 ; Caesars Entertainment Retail, Inc. (Case No. 15-01157 ; Caesars Entertainment Windsor Limited (Case No. 15-01190 ; Caesars Escrow Corporation (Case No. 15-01155 ; Caesars India Sponsor Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01194 ; Caesars License Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01199 ; Caesars Marketing Services Corporation (Case No. 15-01203 ; Caesars Massachusetts Acquisition Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01270 ; Caesars Massachusetts Development Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01166 ; Caesars Massachusetts Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01168 ; Caesars Massachusetts Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01170 ; Caesars New Jersey, Inc. (Case No. 15-01159 ; Caesars Operating Escrow LLC (Case No. 15-01272 ; Caesars Palace Corporation (Case No. 15-01161 ; Caesars Palace Realty Corp. (Case No. 15-01164 ; Caesars Palace Sports Promotions, Inc. (Case No. 15-01169 ; Caesars Riverboat Casino, LLC (Case No. 15-01172 ; Caesars Trex, Inc. (Case No. 15-01171 ; Caesars United Kingdom, Inc. (Case No. 15-01174 ; Caesars World Marketing Corporation (Case No. 15-01176 ; Caesars World Merchandising, Inc. (Case No. 15-01160 ; Caesars World, Inc. (Case No. 15-01173 ; California Clearing Corporation (Case No. 15-01177 ; Casino Computer Programming, Inc. (Case No. 15-01162 ; CG Services, LLC (Case No. 15-01179 ; Chester Facility Holding Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01313 ; Christian County Land Acquisition Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01274 ; Consolidated Supplies, Services and Systems (Case No. 15-01163 ; Corner Investment Company Newco, LLC (Case No. 15-01275 ; Cromwell Manager, LLC (Case No. 15-01276 ; CZL Development Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01278 ; CZL Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01279 ; DCH Exchange, LLC (Case No. 15-01281 ; DCH Lender, LLC (Case No. 15-01282 ; Des Plaines Development Limited Partnership (Case No. 15-01144 ; Desert Palace, Inc. (Case No. 15-01167 ; Durante Holdings, LLC (Case No. 15-01209 ; East Beach Development Corporation (Case No. 15-01175 ; FHR Corporation (Case No. 15-01178 ; FHR Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01212 ; Flamingo-Laughlin Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01216 ; Flamingo-Laughlin, Inc. (Case No. 15-01219 ; GCA Acquisition Subsidiary, Inc. (Case No. 15-01181 ; GNOC, Corp. (Case No. 15-01184 ; Grand Casinos of Biloxi, LLC (Case No. 15-01221 ; Grand Casinos of Mississippi, LLC - Gulfport (Case No. 15-01223 ; Grand Casinos, Inc. (Case No. 15-01186 ; Grand Media Buying, Inc. (Case No. 15-01187 ; Harrah South Shore Corporation (Case No. 15-01224 ; Harrahs Arizona Corporation (Case No. 15-01213 ; Harrahs Bossier City Investment Company, L.L.C. (Case No. 15-01218 ; Harrahs Bossier City Management Company, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Case No. 15-01220 ; Harrahs Chester Downs Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01283 ; Harrahs Chester Downs Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01314 ; Harrahs Illinois Corporation (Case No. 15-01182 ; Harrahs Interactive Investment Company (Case No. 15-01189 ; Harrahs International Holding Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01192 ; Harrahs Investments, Inc. (Case No. 15-01193 ; Harrahs Iowa Arena Management, LLC (Case No. 15-01284 ; Harrahs Management Company (Case No. 15-01195 ; Harrahs Maryland Heights Operating Company (Case No. 15-01286 ; Harrahs MH Project, LLC (Case No. 15-01288 ; Harrahs NC Casino Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01280 ; Harrahs New Orleans Management Company (Case No. 15-01222 ; Harrahs North Kansas City LLC (Case No. 15-01266 ; Harrahs Operating Company Memphis, LLC (Case No. 15-01269 ; Harrahs Pittsburgh Management Company (Case No. 15-01197 ; Harrahs Reno Holding Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01198 ; Harrahs Shreveport Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01225 ; Harrahs Shreveport Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01185 ; Harrahs Shreveport/Bossier City Holding Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01188 ; Harrahs Shreveport/Bossier City Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01262 ; Harrahs Southwest Michigan Casino Corporation (Case No. 15-01201 ; Harrahs Travel, Inc. (Case No. 15-01202 ; Harrahs West Warwick Gaming Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01271 ; Harveys BR Management Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01204 ; Harveys C.C. Management Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01205 ; Harveys Iowa Management Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01206 ; Harveys Tahoe Management Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01191 ; H-BAY, LLC (Case No. 15-01273 ; HBR Realty Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01207 ; HCAL, LLC (Case No. 15-01196 ; HCR Services Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01210 ; HEI Holding Company One, Inc. (Case No. 15-01211 ; HEI Holding Company Two, Inc. (Case No. 15-01214 ; HHLV Management Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01277 ; HIE Holdings Topco, Inc. (Case No. 15-01215 ; Hole in the Wall, LLC (Case No. 15-01285 ; Horseshoe Entertainment (Case No. 15-01200 ; Horseshoe Gaming Holding, LLC (Case No. 15-01227 ; Horseshoe GP, LLC (Case No. 15-01230 ; Horseshoe Hammond, LLC (Case No. 15-01232 ; Horseshoe Shreveport, L.L.C. (Case No. 15-01233 ; HTM Holding, Inc. (Case No. 15-01217 ; JCC Holding Company II Newco, LLC (Case No. 15-01287 ; Koval Holdings Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01289 ; Koval Investment Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01235 ; Las Vegas Golf Management, LLC (Case No. 15-1237 ; Las Vegas Resort Development, Inc. (Case No. 15-01231 ; Laundry Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01239 ; LVH Corporation (Case No. 15-01234 ; LVH Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01241 ; Martial Development Corp. (Case No. 15-01236 ; Nevada Marketing, LLC (Case No. 15-01290 ; New Gaming Capital Partnership, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Case No. 15-01244 ; Ocean Showboat, Inc. (Case No. 15-01238 ; Octavius Linq Holding Co., LLC (Case No. 15-01246 ; Parball Corporation (Case No. 15-01240 ; Parball Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01248 ; PH Employees Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01249 ; PHW Investments, LLC (Case No. 15-01291 ; PHW Las Vegas, LLC (Case No. 15-01251 ; PHW Manager, LLC (Case No. 15-01312 ; Players Bluegrass Downs, Inc. (Case No. 15-01242 ; Players Development, Inc. (Case No. 15-01253 ; Players Holding, LLC (Case No. 15-01255 ; Players International, LLC (Case No. 15-01292 ; Players LC, LLC (Case No. 15-01307 ; Players Maryland Heights Nevada, LLC (Case No. 15-01257 ; Players Resources, Inc. (Case No. 15-01243 ; Players Riverboat II, LLC (Case No. 15-01309 ; Players Riverboat Management, LLC (Case No. 15-01226 ; Players Riverboat, LLC (Case No. 15-01228 ; Players Services, Inc. (Case No. 15-01229 ; Reno Crossroads LLC (Case No. 15-01293 ; Reno Projects, Inc. (Case No. 15-01245 ; Rio Development Company, Inc. (Case No. 15-01247 ; Robinson Property Group Corp. (Case No. 15-01250 ; Roman Entertainment Corporation of Indiana (Case No. 15-01252 ; Roman Holding Corporation of Indiana (Case No. 15-01254 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 1, LLC (Case No. 15-01295 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 2, LLC (Case No. 15-01296 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 3, LLC (Case No. 15-01298 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 4, LLC (Case No. 15-01300 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 5, LLC (Case No. 15-01302 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 6, LLC (Case No. 15-01303 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 7, LLC (Case No. 15-01305 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 8, LLC (Case No. 15-01306 ; Showboat Atlantic City Mezz 9, LLC (Case No. 15-01308 ; Showboat Atlantic City Operating Company, LLC (Case No. 15-01256 ; Showboat Atlantic City Propco, LLC (Case No. 15-01258 ; Showboat Holding, Inc. (Case No. 15-01261 ; Southern Illinois Riverboat/Casino Cruises, Inc. (Case No. 15-01143 ; Tahoe Garage Propco, LLC (Case No. 15-01310 ; The Quad Manager, LLC (Case No. 15-01294 ; TRB Flamingo, LLC (Case No. 15-01299 ; Trigger Real Estate Corporation (Case No. 15-01259 ; Tunica Roadhouse Corporation (Case No. 15-01260 ; Village Walk Construction, LLC (Case No. 15-01304 ; Winnick Holdings, LLC (Case No. 15-01311 ; Winnick Parent, LLC (Case No. 15-01301 Filed by David R Seligman on behalf of Durante Holdings, LLC. (Seligman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/15 3:35 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-01209 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28294860. Fee Amount $1717.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 30+ pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a) Thu 01/15 2:52 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Amount $1717, Filed by David R Seligman on behalf of Durante Holdings, LLC (Seligman, David)
Related: [-]