Original Case: 1:13-cv-00941

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cvpri-01262
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2015
Terminated:Dec 17, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 3:08 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By
Steven J. Balick
Ashby & Geddes P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLOUD SATCHEL, LLC
Represented By
Stamatios Stamoulis
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 2:41 AM EST
Wednesday, January 14, 2015
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 01/13/2015. [209581] Entry of Appearance due 01/28/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/28/2015. Docketing Statement due 01/28/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 03/16/2015.
Related: [-]