Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ben T Barry
Case #: 5:15-bk-70114
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Mar 21, 2016
Claims Deadline:Jun 14, 2016
Converted:Jan 06, 2016
Terminated:Nov 15, 2017
Discharge Objection Deadline:Apr 22, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Archer, LLC
2115 W. Markham Road
Fayetteville, AR 72701
Represented By
Stanley V Bond
Attorney At Law
contact info
Debtor
Sassafras Hill Enterprises, Inc.
2115 W. Markham Road
Fayetteville, AR 72701
Represented By
Stanley V Bond
Attorney At Law
contact info
Debtor
Pratt Place Inn, Inc.
2115 W Markham Rd
Fayetteville, AR 72701-4849
Represented By
Stanley V Bond
Attorney At Law
contact info
David William Brophey
Brophey Law Firm
contact info
Jill R. Jacoway
Jacoway Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


1. Pratt Place to maintain operations in wake of Chapter 11 filing (arkansasonline.com)
Submitted Wed 01/28/2015
Docket last updated: 01/14/2015 6:00 PM CST
Thursday, January 15, 2015
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 01/15 7:38 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Pratt Place Inn, Inc.. (Bond, Stanley)
Related: [-]