Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert J Kressel
Case #: 3:15-bk-30125
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Feb 24, 2015
Terminated:Dec 21, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Sep 25, 2018

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis
226 Summit Ave
Saint Paul, MN 55102-2121
Represented By
Richard D Anderson
Briggs And Morgan
contact info
Benjamin Gurstelle
Briggs And Morgan P A
contact info
James A. Lodoen
Lindquist & Vennum LLP
contact info
John R. McDonald
Briggs And Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Charles E. Nelson
Lindquist & Vennum LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D Smith
Lindquist & Vennum
contact info
Lindquist & Vennum LLP 00000
contact info
Aaron G. Thomas
Briggs And Morgan PA
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Dennis O'Brien
Manty And Associates
contact info
Edwin H. Caldie
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Benjamin J. Court
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Brittany Mitchell
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Phillip J Ashfield
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Creditor Committee
Joseph Egan
Noaker Law Firm LLC 333 Washington Ave N STE 329
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Creditor Committee
Marie Mielke
Jeff Anderson & Associates PA 366 Jackson St STE 100
St Paul, MN 55101
Creditor Committee
James Heutmaker
Jeff Anderson & Associates PA 366 Jackson St STE 100
St Paul, MN 55101
Creditor Committee
Curt Raymond
Jeff Anderson & Associates PA 366 Jackson St STE 100
St Paul, MN 55101
Creditor Committee
John Elstad
All Slaints Catholic Church 19795 Holyoke Avenue
Lakeville, MN 55044
Creditor Committee
Jay Laux
The Church of Saint Anne 2627 Queen Avenue North
Minneapolis, MN 55411
Creditor Committee
Jay Gish
St. Stephen's Catholic Church 525 Jackson Street
Anoka, MN 55303
Creditor Committee
Tim LaPage
St. Mary's of Waverly 607 Maple Avenue
Waverly, MN 55390
Creditor Committee Chair
James Keenan
Jeff Anderson & Associates PA 366 Jackson St STE 100
St Paul, MN 55101
Creditor Committee Chair
Ginny Dwyer
Church of St. Joseph 1154 Sminole Avenue
Lakeville, MN 55118
Creditor Committee Chair
Virginia Dwyer
1260 Yankee Doodle Road Suite 200
Eagan, MN 55121
Other Party
ABUSE CLAIMANT
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415
Represented By
Robert Raschke
Us Trustee Office
contact info
Sarah J Wencil
Us Trustee Office
contact info

GPO Jul 28 2016
Opinion (Lynn MNBM)
GPO Dec 28 2017
Opinion. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)

1. Twin Cities Archdiocese, Abuse Victims at Odds Over Bankruptcy Plan (wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 05/27/2016
2. Archdiocese bankruptcy creditors want deadline pushed back (kare11.com)
Submitted Fri 07/17/2015
3. Bankruptcy has cost archdiocese about $2 million so far (mprnews.org)
Submitted Tue 06/23/2015
4. Resignations, Criminal Charges Cloud Minneapolis Archdiocese's Bankruptcy (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 06/16/2015
5. Parishes get role in archdiocese bankruptcy | The Fergus Falls Daily Journal (fergusfallsjournal.com)
Submitted Mon 05/11/2015
6. Judge: Parishes should have greater say in Twin Cities archdiocese bankruptcy (startribune.com)
Submitted Fri 05/08/2015
7. Archdiocese seeks to shorten window for abuse claims (twincities.com)
Submitted Tue 04/14/2015
8. Minnesota Archdiocese, Abuse Victims at Odds Over Claims Deadline (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 04/13/2015
9. Bankruptcy court gives Twin Cities Archdiocese until November to submit plan (startribune.com)
Submitted Fri 04/10/2015
10. Archdiocese bankruptcy will include search for assets (mprnews.org)
Submitted Tue 02/24/2015
11. Judge orders Twin Cities archdiocese bankruptcy into mediation (startribune.com)
Submitted Wed 01/21/2015
12. Church bankruptcy leaves abuse survivors in limbo (startribune.com)
Submitted Tue 01/20/2015
Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
1321 1321 court MNB Document Wed 02/16 8:21 AM
RECEIPT: ORIGINAL ABUSE CLAIM # 459 TURNED OVER TO ATTORNEY FOR DEBTOR. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]