THE ONE JAMES PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. v. RSUI GROUP, INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph H Rodriguez |
Referred: | Joel Schneider |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00294 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 14, 2015 10:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
RSUI GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THE ONE JAMES PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
18
pgs
order
Opinion
Wed 12/02 2:10 PM
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 12/1/2015. (drw) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 12/02 2:09 PM
ORDER granting Deft's9 Motion to Dismiss. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 12/1/2015. (drw) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Mon 11/30 11:52 AM
The in person motion hearing scheduled for December 1, 2015 at 10:00 am has been adjourned. (db, ) |
||
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 11/18 11:09 AM
TEXT ORDER: Oral Argument on Defendant's9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(b)(6)has been rescheduled for Tuesday, December 1st, 2015 @ 10:00 am in Courtroom 5D. So Ordered by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 11/18/2015. (db, ) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Set/Reset Hearing on Motion
Mon 10/26 4:11 PM
LETTER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT re.9 MOTION to Dismiss for 11/18/2015 @ 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 5D before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 10/26/2015. (drw) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Set/Reset Hearing on Motion
Thu 10/01 3:30 PM
LETTER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT on9 MOTION to Dismiss for 10/29/2015 @ 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 5D before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 10/1/2015. (drw) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/27 2:15 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RSUI GROUP, INC. re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(b)(6) (BAKHOS, BASSEL) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, April 21, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Tue 04/21 10:13 AM
Letter from Bassel Bakhos requesting extension of time to file reply brief in support of Motion to Dismiss. (BAKHOS, BASSEL) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/20 3:22 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by THE ONE JAMES PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(b)(6) (STEFANKIEWICZ, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Thu 04/02 12:08 PM
Letter from David A. Stefankiewicz, Esq.. (STEFANKIEWICZ, DAVID) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/02 10:59 AM
AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 4/20/2015 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (drw) |
||
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Wed 04/01 10:22 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by THE ONE JAMES PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(b)(6) (STEFANKIEWICZ, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 03/05 10:15 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(b)(6) by RSUI GROUP, INC.. Responses due by 4/6/2015(SHER, BRIAN) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 12 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/05 1:09 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 4/6/2015 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (drw, ) |
||
Friday, February 06, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 02/06 2:15 PM
Memorandum in opposition ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by THE ONE JAMES PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.. (STEFANKIEWICZ, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 01/28 3:20 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND. Response due by 3/5/2015. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 1/28/2015. (drw) |
|
Monday, January 26, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Mon 01/26 8:59 AM
Letter from Bassel Bakhos Enclosing Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond.(BAKHOS, BASSEL) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond | ||
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Fri 01/16 12:56 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer.(BAKHOS, BASSEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/16 12:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RSUI GROUP, INC. identifying Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (BAKHOS, BASSEL) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/16 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BASSEL BAKHOS on behalf of RSUI GROUP, INC. (BAKHOS, BASSEL) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Letter: Attorney Not Admitted
Fri 01/16 11:34 AM
Clerk's Letter: Attorney Robert T. Belasco is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (bdk, ) |
|
qc
QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/16 11:37 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (bdk, ) |
||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 01/16 1:44 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by RSUI GROUP, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/5/2015. (drw) |
||
Thursday, January 15, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/16 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RSUI GROUP, INC. from Cape May County Superior Court, case number CPM L 623 14. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6151978), filed by RSUI GROUP, INC..(bdk, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Compliance, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service |