Consolidated
Lead case: 1:14-md-02543

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Referred: James L Cott
Case #: 1:15-cv-00155
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2015
Terminated:Jun 01, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Oct 04, 2015 8:23 AM EDT
Defendant
General Motors LLC
Represented By
Wendy D May
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer LLP
contact info
Jeffrey J Cox
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeanine Bachelder
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Corinna Wilson
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Judd Weisjahn
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Berenice Summerville
Plaintiff
Thomas Stafford
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Austin Lee Slade
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn Simecek
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Maurice Shaffer
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Shaffer
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Gina Lawrimore
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Eugene Landry
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Eduardo Jimenez, Jr.
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Chasity Bliss Kitzmille Green
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
David Fritze
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Andre Edwards
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Dixon
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Delp
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Debbie Champagne
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Benita Black
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Respondent
King & Spalding LLP
Represented By
Tami Scarola Stark
Park Jensen Bennett LLP
contact info
Tai Hyun Park
Park Jensen Bennett LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Tessamena Hankerson
Terminated: 06/23/2015
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan Bastidas
Terminated: 07/27/2015
3714 S. Marine Street No. 3
Santa Ana, CA 92704
Represented By
Mitchell A Toups
Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP
contact info
David B. Franco
The Dugan Law Firm, Aplc
contact info
James R. Dugan, II
Murray Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
295 295 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 03/22 4:05 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff Eduardo Jimenez, Jr., Individually and as representative of the Estate of Jordon Jimenez, Deceased, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release entered into by the parties, hereby gives notice of the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of his lawsuit against General Motors LLC ("New GM"). Court approval was not required. New GM consents to the dismissal with prejudice. Plaintiff and New GM each bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this in 14-MD-2543 and 15-CV-155. The Clerk is further directed to terminate Eduardo Jimenez, Jr., individually and as representative of the Estate of Jordan Jimenez, as Plaintiff in 14-MD-2543 and 15-CV-155. SO ORDERED. Eduardo Jimenez, Jr terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/22/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
294 294 misc Proposed Order Wed 03/22 10:20 AM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Eduardo Jimenez, Jr(as representative of the estate of Jordon Jimenez, deceased), Eduardo Jimenez, Jr(individually). Related Document Number:201 ..(Toups, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
293 293 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/22 9:11 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) General Motors LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Eduardo Jimenez, Jr(as representative of the estate of Jordon Jimenez, deceased), Eduardo Jimenez, Jr(individually). Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 3/22/2023 (tp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/22 8:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Mitchell Toups. RE-FILE Document No. 292 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the PDF attached to the docket entry for the voluntary dismissal is not correct; (2) the wrong event type was used to file the voluntary dismissal. Since counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant signed, Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Wed 03/22 10:22 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 294 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
292 292 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/21 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) General Motors LLC. Document filed by Eduardo Jimenez, Jr. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Toups, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/21 9:04 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Mitchell Toups. RE-FILE Document No. 291 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the wrong event type was used to file the voluntary dismissal; (2) the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected; (3) the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not physically signed by all parties who have appeared. Since counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant signed, Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct individual filer/filers - select the correct individual party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
291 291 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/20 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Eduardo Jimenez, Jr. Document filed by Eduardo Jimenez, Jr. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Toups, Mitchell)
Related: [-]