Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Lance M Africk
Referred: Daniel E Knowles, III
Case #: 2:15-cv-00112
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:30504 Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2015
Terminated:Oct 27, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 15, 2015 9:16 AM CDT
Claimant
Gary Lynn Hyatt
Represented By
Gilbert Hennigan Dozier
Gilbert H. Dozier, Aplc
contact info
Claimant
Wendy Sue Hyatt
Represented By
Gilbert Hennigan Dozier
Gilbert H. Dozier, Aplc
contact info
Petitioner
CDM Resource Management LLC
Represented By
Daniel B. Stanton
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
James Robert Silverstein
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Brett P. Fenasci
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Petitioner
Energy Transfer Partners, LP
Represented By
Daniel B. Stanton
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
James Robert Silverstein
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Brett P. Fenasci
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Petitioner
Hilcorp Energy Company
Represented By
Daniel B. Stanton
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
James Robert Silverstein
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Brett P. Fenasci
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Petitioner
Regency Energy Partners, LP
Represented By
Daniel B. Stanton
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
James Robert Silverstein
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Brett P. Fenasci
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Petitioner
Regency GP, LLC
Represented By
Daniel B. Stanton
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
James Robert Silverstein
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Brett P. Fenasci
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info

GPO Oct 27 2015
ORDER AND REASONS denying 33 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, each party to bear its own costs. FURTHER ORDERED that this Court's previous 8 order staying and restraining all other suits, actions, or legal proceedings arising out of or in connection with the voyage of the Miss Laurie on December 6, 2013, is hereby VACATED AND DISSOLVED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/27/2015.(blg)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, July 15, 2016
50 50 appeal USCA Judgment Mon 07/18 10:47 AM
USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 7/15/2016 dismissing47 Notice of Appeal, filed by Regency GP, LLC, Hilcorp Energy Company, CDM Resource Management LLC, Energy Transfer Partners, LP, Regency Energy Partners, LP. USCA Clerk. (blg)
Related: [-]