New York Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert E Littlefield Jr
Case #: 1:15-bk-10082
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Feb 26, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jul 16, 2015
Dismissed:Nov 16, 2017
Terminated:Dec 21, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Mar 17, 2017
Discharge Objection Deadline:Apr 27, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
National Sports Academy at Lake Placid
821 Mirror Lake Dr
Lake Placid, NY 12946-3829
Represented By
Christopher James Baum
Baum & Bailey, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 74 Chapel Street, Suite 200
Albany, NY 12207
Represented By
Kevin Purcell
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


1. Training Ground for Winter Olympians Seeks Chapter 11 (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 02/03/2015
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, December 21, 2017
251 251 1 pgs order Order Closing Dismissed Thu 12/21 9:56 AM
Order Closing Dismissed Case and Discharging Trustee. . (Coughlin, Kathy)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 12/21 9:57 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Coughlin, Kathy)
Related: [-]