Original Case: 5:13-cv-01818

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cvpri-01273
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2015
Terminated:Oct 15, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 3:44 AM EST
Defendant
DOES, 2-10, INCLUSIVE
Defendant - Appellee
CRAIG A. OEHME, dba E.E. Pauley Plastic Extrusion
Represented By
Andrew Dallmann
Burch Dallmann LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BENJAMIN OEHME
Represented By
Andrew Dallmann
Burch Dallmann LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VINYL VISIONS, LLC
Represented By
Alan Steven Yockelson
Law Office of Alan S. Yockelson
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 2:39 AM EST
Friday, January 16, 2015
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 01/15/2015. [210586] Entry of Appearance due 01/30/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/30/2015. Docketing Statement due 01/30/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 03/17/2015.
Related: [-]