Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:12-cr-00003
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2012
Defendant
Adrian Demond Noel
Defendant
Anna Lerey Woodall
Defendant
Chelsey Lynn Jones
Defendant
Christine Francis Sirmans
Defendant
David Lynn Sirmans
Defendant
Debra Perry Robinson
Defendant
Dennis James Perry
Defendant
Gregory Scott Covey
Defendant
Jessica Nicole Bickham
Defendant
Marcy Sanders
Defendant
Mindy Gail Tims
Defendant
Peggy Ann Davis
Defendant
Ronald Dean Wisdom
Defendant
SEALED DFT 11
Defendant
SEALED DFT 8
Defendant
Shonda Michelle Jones
Defendant
Tammy Rene Price
Defendant
Tracy Renee Hampton
Defendant
Wanda Guthrie Apple
Interested Party
USM-Marshall
Interested Party
USPO Marshall
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Apr 03 2012
FINDINGS OF FACT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Tracy Renee Hampton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 4/3/2012. (sm, )
GPO Apr 03 2012
FINDINGS OF FACT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Tammy Rene Price. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 4/3/2012. (sm, )
GPO Apr 26 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Tammy Rene Price for 195 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/2012. (sm, )
GPO Apr 26 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Tracy Renee Hampton for 194 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/2012. (sm, )
GPO May 07 2012
FINDINGS OF FACT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Ronald Dean Wisdom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 5/4/2012. (sm, )
GPO May 11 2012
FINDINGS OF FACT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Adrian Demond Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 5/10/2012. (sm, )
GPO May 11 2012
FINDINGS OF FACT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Jessica Nicole Bickham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 5/10/2012. (sm, )
GPO May 11 2012
FINDINGS OF FACT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Anna Lerey Woodall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 5/11/2012. (sm, )
GPO Jun 12 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Adrian Demond Noel for 221 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea ORDERING that Court finds dft GUILTY of Count 525 of indictment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/12/2012. (sm, )
GPO Jun 12 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Anna Lerey Woodall for 227 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/12/2012. (sm, )
GPO Jun 12 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Jessica Nicole Bickham for 222 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/12/2012. (sm, )
GPO Jun 12 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Ronald Dean Wisdom for 219 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/12/2012. (sm, )
GPO Jun 13 2012
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Chelsey Lynn Jones Objections to R&R due by 7/2/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on June 13, 2012. (rml, )
GPO Jul 30 2012
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND FINDING DEFENDANT GUILTY as to Peggy Ann Davis. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/30/12. (bas)
GPO Aug 13 2012
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on Plea of Guilty as to Gregory Scott Covey. Objections to R&R due by 8/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 8/13/12. (bas)
GPO Aug 13 2012
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on Plea of Guilty as to Christine Francis Sirmans. Objections to R&R due by 8/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 8/13/12. (bas)
GPO Sep 07 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND FINDING DEFENDANT GUILTY as to Christine Francis Sirmans for 328 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/7/12. (mrm, )
GPO Sep 07 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND FINDING DEFENDANT GUILTY as to Gregory Scott Covey for 327 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/7/12. (mrm, )
GPO Sep 27 2012
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Chelsey Lynn Jones for 261 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/27/12. (bas)
GPO Sep 27 2012
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND FINDING DEFENDANT GUILTY on Marcy Sanders. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/27/12. (bas)
GPO Sep 27 2012
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND FINDING DEFENANT RECOMMENDATIONS as to Debra Perry Robinson. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/27/12. (bas)
GPO Sep 27 2012
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND FINDING DEFENDANT GUILTY as to Wanda Guthrie Apple. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/27/12. (bas)
GPO Jan 07 2013
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to David Lynn Sirmans. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/7/13. (bas, )
GPO Jan 31 2013
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Mindy Gail Tims Objections to R&R due by 2/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/31/13. (bas, )
GPO Feb 14 2013
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to David Lynn Sirmans for 438 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/13. (bas, )
GPO Apr 01 2013
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Mindy Gail Tims for 448 Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/31/13. (bas, )
GPO Jun 05 2017
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Supervised Release Violation as to Tracy Renee Hampton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/5/2017. (sm, )
GPO Jun 05 2017
ORDER ADOPTING 619 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Tracy Renee Hampton. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2017. (sm, )
GPO Feb 07 2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Adrian Demond Noel re 628 SEALED Petition for Warrant or Summons as to Adrian Demond Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/7/2018. (ch, )
GPO Feb 09 2018
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Adrian Demond Noel for 640 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that the Defendant=s plea of true to allegation #3 as set forth in the government=s petition be ACCEPTED. ORDERED that the Defendant=s supervised release be REVOKED. The Defendant be committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a term of four months, with no supervised release to follow such term of imprisonment. The Defendant shall receive credit for time served. The Court recommended service of sentence at FCI Texarkana. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/2018. (ch, )
GPO Jan 14 2019
MEMORANDUM ORDER ON FINDINGS OF FACT AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Gregory Scott Covey. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/14/2019. (ch, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.