Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:15-bk-40113
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2015
Terminated:Jan 11, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Nov 02, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Matt's Tex Mex Roanoke, LLC
113 N Oak St
Roanoke, TX 76262-6619
Represented By
Joyce W. Lindauer
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Saturday, January 13, 2018
204 204 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/13 11:52 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 202 Agreed Order on Motion To Reopen Case (RE: related document(s)194 Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case . Filed by Jacob Barnes and Inessa Barnes, Trustees of the Jacob and Inessa Barnes 2002 Revocable Trust). (lc)
203 203 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/13 11:52 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 201 Agreed Order on (RE: related document(s)192 Motion to Determine Applicability of Permanent Injunction Filed by Jacob Barnes and Inessa Barnes, Trustees of the Jacob and Inessa Barnes 2002 Revocable Trust). (lc) Modified on 1/11/2018 (lc).
Thursday, January 11, 2018
202 202 order Reopen Chapter 11 Case Thu 01/11 10:36 AM
Agreed Order on Motion To Reopen Case Related [+]. (lc)
Related: [-] 194 Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case . Filed by Jacob Barnes and Inessa Barnes, Trustees of the Jacob and Inessa Barnes 2002 Revocable Trust
201 201 2 pgs order Order on Motion (Generic) Thu 01/11 10:34 AM
Agreed Order on Related [+]. (lc) Modified on 1/11/2018 (lc)
Related: [-] 192 Motion to Determine Applicability of Permanent Injunction Filed by Jacob Barnes and Inessa Barnes, Trustees of the Jacob and Inessa Barnes 2002 Revocable Trust
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 01/11 10:41 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
court POrder Note Wed 01/10 12:16 PM
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Wed 01/10 12:16 PM
Proposed Order or Judgment Submitted At Court's Direction RE:192 Motion (Generic )
Related: [-]