Heeren, LLC v. Cherry Growers, Inc.
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Holmes Bell |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00047 |
Nature of Suit | 891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts |
Cause | 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 18, 2015 9:45 AM EDT |
defendant
Cherry Growers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Heeren Bros., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Heeren, LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 23 2015
OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb) |
|
GPO
May 27 2016
OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb) |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
69 | 69
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 08/16 8:17 AM
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal44 granting the stipulation to dismiss; the appeal is dismissed ; no mandate to issue (pjw) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
68 | 68
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/12 4:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Heeren, LLC re Termination of Garnishment66 , Termination of Garnishment67 , Termination of Garnishment64 , Termination of Garnishment65 (Bevins, David) |
|
67 | 67
misc
Termination of Garnishment
Fri 08/12 3:35 PM
TERMINATION of garnishment as to garnishee Cherry Central Cooperative, Inc. re62 and 57 (Bevins, David) |
|
66 | 66
misc
Termination of Garnishment
Fri 08/12 3:34 PM
TERMINATION of garnishment as to garnishee Cherry Central Cooperative, Inc. re60 and 55 (Bevins, David) |
|
65 | 65
misc
Termination of Garnishment
Fri 08/12 3:32 PM
TERMINATION of garnishment as to garnishee Kuhn Rogers PLC re63 and 58 (Bevins, David) |
|
64 | 64
misc
Termination of Garnishment
Fri 08/12 3:25 PM
TERMINATION of garnishment as to garnishee Huntington National Bank re61 and 56 (Bevins, David) |