Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William C Hillman
Case #: 1:15-bk-10214
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Apr 21, 2015
Terminated:May 28, 2015

Debtor
Kickass Cupcakes, Inc
10 Milton St # 2
Dorchester, MA 02124-5233
Represented By
Laurel E. Bretta
Bretta & Grimaldi, PA
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109
Trustee
Stewart F. Grossman
Looney & Grossman 101 Arch Street
Boston, MA 02110


1. Kickass Cupcakes stales, files bankruptcy | Boston Herald (bostonherald.com)
Submitted Thu 01/22/2015
Docket last updated: 01/20/2015 7:08 PM EST
Tuesday, January 20, 2015
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 15-10214 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 14415046, amount $ 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Meeting of Creditors is scheduled on 02/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Room 325-B, U.S. Trustee Office, J.W. McCormack Post Office & Court House. (admin, )
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition All Schedules and Statements and Matrix. Filing Fee in the Amount of $335 Filed by Kickass Cupcakes, Inc. (Bretta, Laurel)
Related: [-]
2 2 Matrix, Verification of Creditor Matrix Related [+] filed by Debtor Kickass Cupcakes, Inc (Bretta, Laurel)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
3 3 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Laurel E. Bretta in the amount of $5500.00. Plus $335.00 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor Kickass Cupcakes, Inc (Bretta, Laurel)
Related: [-]
4 4 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Debtor Kickass Cupcakes, Inc (Bretta, Laurel)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)