Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Lawrence F Stengel
Case #: 5:15-cv-00223
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2015
Terminated:Mar 23, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 15, 2015 9:00 AM EDT
Defendant
WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By
MELISSA A. ANDERSON
Conrad O'Brien PC
contact info
MATTHEW H. HAVERSTICK
Conrad O'Brien
contact info
CURTIS B. KRASIK
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
JERRY S. MCDEVITT
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VITO LOGRASSO
Represented By
HARRIS L. POGUST
Pogust & Braslow Llc.
contact info
Plaintiff
EVAN SINGLETON
Represented By
HARRIS L. POGUST
Pogust & Braslow Llc.
contact info


1. Former Wrestlers File Concussion Lawsuit Against WWE (abcnews.go.com)
Submitted Wed 01/21/2015
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
misc Case Transferred Out Tue 03/24 9:36 AM
Original record transferred to the District of CONNECTICUT via interdistrict transfer system. (eibo, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
11 11 order Order Transferring Case Mon 03/23 3:52 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE IS GRANTED AND THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT SUCH ORDER SHALL BE IMPLEMENTED IMMEDIATELY WITHOUT THE 21 DAY STAY PERIOD, AND DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE ON WHICH THE CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/23/2015. 3/23/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2015
10 10 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 03/06 3:17 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC..(HAVERSTICK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/06 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. ANDERSON on behalf of WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANDERSON, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/02 4:33 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF CURTIS B. KRASIK IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/2/2015.3/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/02 4:31 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF JERRY S. MCDEVITT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/2/2015.3/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 27, 2015
6 6 motion Change Venue Fri 02/27 2:36 PM
MOTION to Change Venue filed by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(HAVERSTICK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 26, 2015
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/26 2:31 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Curtis B. Krasik filed by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC..Certificate of Service.(HAVERSTICK, MATTHEW) (FILING FEE PAID $40. RECEIPT NO 116799) Modified on 2/26/2015 (kp, )
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/26 2:30 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jerry S. McDevitt filed by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC..Certificate of Service.(HAVERSTICK, MATTHEW) (FILING FEE PAID $40. RECEIPT NO 116799) Modified on 2/26/2015 (kp, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 25, 2015
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/25 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW H. HAVERSTICK on behalf of WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(HAVERSTICK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 18, 2015
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/18 1:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EVAN SINGLETON, VITO LOGRASSO. WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. waiver sent on 1/29/2015, answer due 3/30/2015. (POGUST, HARRIS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 16, 2015
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/20 8:33 AM
COMPLAINT against WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 114559.), filed by EVAN SINGLETON, VITO LOGRASSO.(tj, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form
service Summons Issued Tue 01/20 8:33 AM
Summons Issued as to WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/19/15 (tj, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 01/20 8:34 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by VITO LOGRASSO, EVAN SINGLETON. (tj, )
Related: [-]