Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Lawrence F Stengel
Case #: 5:15-cv-00248
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2015
Terminated:Jul 17, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Jul 19, 2015 8:59 AM EDT
Defendant
KWLT, LLC
Represented By
JOSEPH W. JESIOLOWSKI
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
STEPHANIE L. KOSTA
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
MATTHEW T. CROSLIS
Croslis Law Offices LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIANA FRANK
Represented By
RICHARD J. ORLOSKI
Orloski Law Firm
contact info
STEVEN C. AMECHE
The Orloski Law Firm
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 21, 2015
25 25 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 09/21 4:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 9/21/15. (ky, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2015
24 24 order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 07/17 3:31 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 7/17/15. 7/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 07/17 3:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: An In Person Settlement Conference was held on 7/16/15. (ky, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2015
22 22 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/07 3:30 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF STEVEN C. AMECHE, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO.20 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 5/7/2015.5/7/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
21 21 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 05/06 4:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 5/6/15. (ky, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/05 3:51 PM
MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY STEVEN C. AMECHE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF BRIANA FRANK, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILING FEE OF $40.00 PAID)(ky, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2015
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/04 4:05 PM
First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by BRIANA FRANK.Certificate of Service.(ORLOSKI, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 24, 2015
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/24 5:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BRIANA FRANK. (ORLOSKI, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/14 2:40 PM
ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 7/16/2015 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 4/14/15. 4/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND SERVED BY CHAMBERS. (ky, )
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/14 2:20 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/6/2015 AT 3:30 P.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 4/13/15. 4/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND SERVED BY CHAMBERS. (ky, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/16 2:42 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/6/2015 03:30 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. (tjd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/10 3:46 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KWLT, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(JESIOLOWSKI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
14 14 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Thu 04/09 2:05 PM
ORDER THAT DISCOVERY IS STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 4/8/2015. 4/9/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 04/07 2:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL re: A Rule 16 Conference was held on 4/7/15. (ky, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2015
12 12 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/31 8:46 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO.9 ), IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/30/2015.3/31/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/25 10:28 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against KWLT, LLC, filed by BRIANA FRANK.(ky, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2015
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/19 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE L. KOSTA on behalf of KWLT, LLC with Cert of Service(KOSTA, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/16 4:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KWLT, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(JESIOLOWSKI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/16 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH W. JESIOLOWSKI on behalf of KWLT, LLC with Certificate of Service(JESIOLOWSKI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/10 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:A TELEPHONE RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 4/7/2015 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL. COUNSEL SHALL COMPLY WITH THE INSTRUCTIONS IN THE ATTACHED NOTICE.(pac,)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 24, 2015
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 02/24 12:29 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by KWLT, LLC.(CROSLIS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 23, 2015
5 5 order Order Setting Answer Deadline Mon 02/23 12:26 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO.4 ), IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 3/16/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 2/19/2015. 2/23/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 18, 2015
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/18 6:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint filed by KWLT, LLC.Certificate of Service.(CROSLIS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 13, 2015
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Fri 02/13 12:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Charleah Sandt re: served Summons & Complaint upon T. House by Certified US Mail on Unknown (ORLOSKI, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 27, 2015
2 2 service Affidavit of Service Tue 01/27 2:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph York re: served Summons & Civil Complaint upon Croslis Law Office attorney for KWLT, LLC. by Personal on 01/27/2015 (ORLOSKI, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 20, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/20 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT against KWLT, LLC., filed by BRIANA FRANK.(er, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CIVIL COVER SHEETS
service Summons Issued Tue 01/20 4:39 PM
Summons Issued as to KWLT, LLC. 1 Original Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/20/15 (er, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 01/20 4:40 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRIANA FRANK. (er, )
Related: [-]