Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:15-bk-10104
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2015
Claims Deadline:May 04, 2015
Terminated:Apr 07, 2017
Plan Confirmed:May 14, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hipcricket, Inc.
110 110th Ave NE Ste 410
Bellevue, WA 98004-5861
Represented By
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Debtor
Hipcricket, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
110 110th Ave NE Ste 410
Bellevue, WA 98004-5861
Represented By
John S. Kaplan
Perkins Cole LLP
contact info
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Ira D Kharasch
contact info
Linda F. Cantor
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Brian E Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kornfeld
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Peter J. Keane
Pachulski Stang Young & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy
www.omnimgt.com 5955 DeSoto Avenue Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Jay R. Indyke
Cooley LLP
contact info
Jeremy H. Rothstein
The Grace Building
contact info
John Henry Schanne, II
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Donald J. Detweiler
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Alex R. Velinsky
Cooley LLP
contact info
Henry Jon Jaffe
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Lawrence Cohen
Cooley LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Friday, April 07, 2017
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 04/07 10:10 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
639 639 claims Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 Thu 04/06 2:25 PM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy. (Osborne, Brian)
Related: [-]