New Jersey District Court
Judge:Stanley R Chesler
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:15-cv-00426
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2015
Re-opened:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Sep 30, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 21, 2015 8:52 AM EDT
Defendant
LOU LAMORIELLO
Represented By
SETH R. GOLDMAN
Mintz Levin Cohen Ferris Glovsky & Popeo PC
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD KREZWICK
Represented By
ROBERT B. MELLMAN
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
15 15 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/30 1:25 PM
STIPULATION/ORDER OF DISMISSAL between parties in its entirety w/prejudice & w/out costs. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 9/30/15. (DD, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2015
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/29 11:01 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by LOU LAMORIELLO. (GOLDMAN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
13 13 order Order Tue 09/15 10:23 AM
ORDER permitting an extension of time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint until 9/29/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/15/15. (sr, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 09/15 10:24 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - RE:13 Order as to deft, LOU LAMORIELLO. The answer due date has been set for 9/29/15. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2015
12 12 misc Letter Mon 09/14 3:28 PM
Letter from Seth R. Goldman, Esq. re1 Complaint. (GOLDMAN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
11 11 order Stipulation and Order Tue 07/14 10:45 AM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME for deft., LOU LAMORIELLO to answer Cmp. until 9/15/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/14/15. (DD, )
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/14 10:11 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to GAIL I. AUSTER, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/14/15. (DD, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 07/14 10:46 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document11 Stipulation and Order submitted by LOU LAMORIELLO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/15/15. (DD, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2015
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 07/10 3:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by LOU LAMORIELLO. (GOLDMAN, SETH)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/10 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. GOLDMAN on behalf of LOU LAMORIELLO (GOLDMAN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
7 7 order Order Reopening Case Wed 06/24 1:30 PM
ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 6/24/15. (DD, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/24 11:56 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 6/24/15. (tt, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Thu 05/21 11:41 AM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41.1a Motion set for 6/24/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (tt, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2015
4 4 service Certificate of Service Thu 05/14 3:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RICHARD KREZWICK (MELLMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/10 9:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/6/2015 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2015
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/09 10:57 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RICHARD KREZWICK.(MELLMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Gail I. Auster, who is seeking Pro Hac Vice admission,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, January 22, 2015
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 01/22 3:49 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to LOU LAMORIELLO Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *STEPHEN BOND* (seb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/22 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against LOU LAMORIELLO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6164933), filed by RICHARD KREZWICK.(seb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet