Colorado District Court
Judge:Marcia S Krieger
Referred: Michael J Watanabe
Case #: 1:14-cv-03303
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2014
Terminated:Feb 03, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 4:34 PM MDT
Defendant
Edmonds, Russell, & Logue PC
Represented By
Rocklon Lee Edmonds
Edmonds, Russell & Logue, PC
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Logue
Edmonds, Russell & Logue, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl Matchett
Represented By
Jenny Diane DeFrancisco
Lemberg & Associates L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Matchett
Represented By
Jenny Diane DeFrancisco
Lemberg & Associates L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, February 03, 2015
16 16 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Tue 02/03 3:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal filed in this case on 2/2/15. Text Only Entry (dkals, )
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Tue 02/03 10:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER Docketed in incorrect case. Please ignore entry Setting Hearing on Motion 55 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Expert Rebuttal Deadline. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/3/2015. (emill) Modified on 2/3/2015 to add text (emill).
Related: [-]
14 14 order Minute Order Tue 02/03 10:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER In light of13 Notice of Withdrawal of Complaint and Voluntary Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a), the Scheduling Conference 2/9/2015 11:00 AM is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/3/2015. (emill)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 02, 2015
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Mon 02/02 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Carl Matchett, Donna Matchett (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 30, 2015
12 12 order Order Fri 01/30 10:08 AM
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/30/15. Text Only Entry (pglov)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 01/28 12:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/27/15. Edmonds, Russell, & Logue PC shall answer by 2/9/2015. (dkals, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 27, 2015
10 10 order Memorandum Tue 01/27 12:26 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Edmonds, Russell, & Logue PC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/27/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/27 12:26 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/27/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Mon 01/26 3:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Edmonds, Russell, & Logue PC.(Logue, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Thursday, January 22, 2015
7 7 misc Letter Reassigning Case Thu 01/22 3:16 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. Consent not achieved. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger. As no Order of Reference has been entered, all future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-03303-MSK. In the event an Order of Reference is entered, the case should be designated as 14-cv-03303-MSK-MJW.(Text Only Entry) (emill)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 01/22 10:34 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Carl Matchett, Donna Matchett. (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 08, 2014
5 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/08/2014. Consent Form due on or before 1/26/2015. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 2/9/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 05, 2014
4 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges. (jofox )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (jofox )
Related: [-]
2 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Edmonds, Russell, & Logue PC by Plaintiffs Carl Matchett, Donna Matchett. (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Edmonds, Russell, & Logue PC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4172026)Attorney Jenny Diane DeFrancisco added to party Carl Matchett(pty:pla), Attorney Jenny Diane DeFrancisco added to party Donna Matchett(pty:pla), filed by Carl Matchett, Donna Matchett.(DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet