AlphaCap Ventures LLC v. Angelsoft LLC d/b/a Gust
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00056 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 22, 2015 8:10 AM CDT |
Consol Defendant
RocketHub, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
AlphaCap Ventures, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Angelsoft LLC d/b/a Gust
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
AlphaCap Ventures LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angelsoft LLC d/b/a Gust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AlphaCap Ventures LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Consol Defendant
Innovational Funding, LLC
Terminated: 07/01/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Thu 03/17 8:22 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Southern District of New York as to Order of Transfer/Case Transferred Out - District Transfer. Opened in Southern Dist of NY as case 1:16cv1784 filed 3/9/2016. (sm, ) |